This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2022 at 07:28:05 (UTC).

Doe v. Jennings et al

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 Doe filed an Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee lawsuit against Jennings. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jon S. Tigar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-08567

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Habeas Corpus Alien Detainee

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon S. Tigar

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JANE DOE

Respondents

Tae D. Johnson

Alejandro Mayorkas

David Jennings

Merrick B. Garland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Roxana Moussavian

Attorney at Pangea Legal Services

391 Sutter Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94108

Amalia Margarete Wille

Attorney at Lakin & Wille LLP

1939 Harrison Street, Suite 420

Oakland, CA 94612

Etan Z. Newman

Attorney at Pangea Legal Services

391 Sutter Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jehan Marie Laner

Attorney at Pangea Legal Services

391 Sutter Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94108

Priya Arvind Patel

Attorney at Centro Legal de la Raza

3400 East 12Th Street

Oakland, CA 94601

Susan M. Beaty

Attorney at Centro Legal de la Raza

3400 East 12Th Street

Oakland, CA 94601

Judah Ben Lakin

Attorney at Lakin & Wille LLP

1939 Harrison Street, Suite 420

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent Attorneys

John Wesley Samples

Attorney at The United States Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Avenue, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Timothy G. Hayes

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, Civil Division

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Sarah Stevens Wilson

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 878, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2021. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#27

(#27) ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #25 Motion for TRO. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

#26

RESTRICTED

#23

RESTRICTED

#21

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jane Doe. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2021. (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon S. Tigar: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2021 via Zoom videoconference re #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jane Doe ; granting #32 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for leave to file an overlength brief re 31 Order,, filed by Jane Doe. Motion to file overlength brief is granted. Argument heard from parties regarding preliminary injunction. Motion taken under submission. Written order to issue.FTR Time: Zoom Recording 9:30 - 10:25. Plaintiff Attorney: Roxana Moussavian, Susan Beaty, Judah Lakin. Defendant Attorney: Timothy Hayes, Sarah Wilson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2021) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for leave to file an overlength brief re 31 Order,, filed by Jane Doe. Responses due by 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Overlength Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Jehan Laner, #3 Proposed Order)(Laner, Jehan) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docket(#31) ORDERThe format of Petitioner's reply brief, ECF No. 29, appears to violate the Court's local rules. See Civ. L.R. 3-4(c)(2) (providing that "[t]ext must appear on one side only and must be double-spaced with no more than 28 lines per page"). This violation, if there was one, is equivalent to the filing of an overlength brief. Petitioner's counsel should be prepared to address this issue at tomorrow's hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Tigar, Jon) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 09:30 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than December 15, 2021 by Noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #27 Order o n Motion for TRO. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2021 09:30 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. (Related documents(s) #27 ) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Brief re #28 Response ( Non Motion ), #27 Order on Motion for TRO Petitioner's Reply to Respondents' Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byJane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit VV-YY, #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #28 , #27 ) (Moussavian, Roxana) (Filed on 12/10/2021) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition to Preliminary Injunction by Merrick B. Garland, David Jennings, Tae D. Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DRO Office Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exh. A-1: Disciplinary Record, #3 Exhibit Exh. A-2: Denver Facility Transfer, #4 Exhibit Exh. A-3: Housing Changes, #5 Exhibit Exh. A-4: Mental Health Refusal, #6 Exhibit Exh. A-5: Medical Records, #7 Exhibit Exh. B: Discharge Documentation)(Hayes, Timothy) (Filed on 12/7/2021) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #25 Motion for TRO. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) EXHIBITS UU re #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jane Doe. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Moussavian, Roxana) (Filed on 12/1/2021) Modified on 12/3/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit s RR and SS, #3 Copy of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Federal Complaint, #4 Copy of Exhibits A-P, #5 Copy of Exhibits Q-RR, #6 Proposed Order and Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Moussavian, Roxana) (Filed on 12/1/2021) Modified on 12/3/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Petition, filed by Jane Doe. Please re-file 1-5 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ONLY as a separate entry. Using the event >Civil > gt;Motions and Related Filings >Motions - General >Proceed in Forma Pauperis. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jehan Marie Laner (Laner, Jehan) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by JANE DOE.. (Moussavian, Roxana) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Docket(#6) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/18/2021. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonym re #1 Petition, filed by Jane Doe. Responses due by 11/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Moussavian, Roxana) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Judah Ben Lakin (Lakin, Judah) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Jane Doe. Amendment to Electronic Filing Error. (Moussavian, Roxana) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Moussavian, Roxana) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 version from https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until the document is e- filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint,, Petition, filed by JANE DOE (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against David Jennings, Tae D. Johnson, Alejandro Mayorkas, Merrick B. Garland (Filing Fee IFPP). Filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Authenticating Exhibits, #2 Exhibit (A-P), #3 Exhibit (Q-RR), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #6 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #7 Proposed Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (Moussavian, Roxana) (Filed on 11/3/2021) Modified on 11/4/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Wesley Samples

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Stevens Wilson