This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:01:24 (UTC).

Doe v. Dordt University et al--PER #5 ORDER SET #2 MOTION RESPONSE DDL FOR 2 WEEKS AFTER DEFTS FILE APPEARANCE

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Doe filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Dordt University --PER 5 ORDER SET 2 MOTION RESPONSE DDL FOR 2 WEEKS AFTER DEFTS FILE APPEARANCE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly K.E. Mahoney and CJ Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-04082

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe

Defendants

Derek Buteyn

Howard Wilson

Dordt University

Erin Olson

Robert Taylor

Dordt University Board of Trustees

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy K Davis

Attorney at Amy Davis Law Firm PLLC

501 Sw 7Th Street, Suite J, ***Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

David Harris Goldman

Attorney at Babich Goldman, PC

501 Sw 7Th Street, Suite J, **Ecf

Des Moines, IA 50309

Andrew T Miltenberg

Attorney at Nesenoff and Miltenberg LLP

363 Seventh Avenue, 5Th Floor, ***Ecf

New York, NY 10001

Stuart Bernstein

Attorney at Nesenoff and Miltenberg LLP

363 Seventh Avenue, 5Th Floor, ***Ecf

New York, NY 10001

Adrienne D Levy

Attorney at Nesenoff and Miltenberg LLP

363 Seventh Avenue, 5Th Floor, ***Ecf

New York, NY 10001

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy K Davis on behalf of John Doe. (Davis, Amy) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. All Defendants. (Levy, Adrienne) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

6 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adrienne Levy ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085021) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart Bernstein ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085027) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

7 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085023) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

8 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#2

(#2) Motion File under Pseudonym by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Brief, #12 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Amy) Modified on 12/5/2019 (ksy). (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/5/2019) (ksy). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #9

Exhibit

#5

(#5) ORDER re #2 Motion to proceed under Pseudonym filed by Plaintiff John Doe. Plaintiffs request for ex parte relief is denied. The motion to proceed under pseudonym will be held in abeyance until Defendants enter their appearances in this case. Defendants will have two weeks after their entry of appearance to file a response to the motion. The case shall remain as filed, with Plaintiff appearing as John Doe, until the motion to proceed under pseudonym is decided. Defendants are prohibited from publicly identifying Plaintiff in court filings or otherwise pending resolution of the motion to proceed under pseudonym. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/9/2019. (des) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

2 #8

Exhibit

2 #11

Brief

2 #10

Exhibit

2 #12

Text of Proposed Order

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Exhibit

2 #1

Declaration

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy K Davis on behalf of John Doe. (Davis, Amy) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. All Defendants. (Levy, Adrienne) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on the #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adrienne Levy, #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg, and #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart Bernstein on behalf of Plaintiff John Doe. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/2019. (skm) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stuart Bernstein ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085027) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew T. Miltenberg ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085023) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Adrienne Levy ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3085021) by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, Amy) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #2 Motion to proceed under Pseudonym filed by Plaintiff John Doe. Plaintiffs request for ex parte relief is denied. The motion to proceed under pseudonym will be held in abeyance until Defendants enter their appearances in this case. Defendants will have two weeks after their entry of appearance to file a response to the motion. The case shall remain as filed, with Plaintiff appearing as John Doe, until the motion to proceed under pseudonym is decided. Defendants are prohibited from publicly identifying Plaintiff in court filings or otherwise pending resolution of the motion to proceed under pseudonym. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 12/9/2019. (des) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (kms) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge CJ Williams and Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. No conflicts identified. (kms) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by John Doe of filing Motion to file Under Pseudonym Oral Argument Requested (Davis, Amy) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/5/2019) (ksy). Modified text on 12/6/2019 (kms). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion File under Pseudonym by Plaintiff John Doe (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Brief, #12 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, Amy) Modified on 12/5/2019 (ksy). (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/5/2019) (ksy). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-3076264.), filed by John Doe. Scheduling Report due by 3/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Amy) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/5/2019) (ksy). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.