This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2022 at 22:37:53 (UTC).

Doe I et al v. Weinstein et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Doe I filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Weinstein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George B. Daniels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05241

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jane Doe I

Jane Doe II

Jane Doe III

Jane Doe IV

Defendants

Robert Weinstein

The Walt Disney Company

Miramax Film NY LLC f/k/a Miramax Film Corp.

Disney Enterpries, Inc.

Harvey Weinstein

Doe Corp. 1-10

Miramax Holding Corp.

Miramax Film NY LLC

Miramax Film Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Koel Merson

Attorney at Merson Law, PLLC

950 Third Avenue, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Giovanna Mabile Ferreira dos Santos

Attorney at Merson Law, PLLC

150 East 58Th Street, Ste 34Th Fl.

New York, NY 10155

Defendant Attorneys

Abigail Flynn Coster

Attorney at Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC

640 Fifth Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Brian Theodore Kohn

Attorney at Schulte, Roth & Zabel LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gary Stein

Attorney at Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP (NY)

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Evan R. Chesler

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

825 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Joe Wesley Earnhardt

Attorney at Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP

825 8Th Avenue

New York, NY 10024

Imran H. Ansari

Attorney at Aidala Bertuna & Kamins PC

546 Fifth Avenue, Ste 6Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance re: #8 Notice of Appearance. Document filed by Robert Weinstein..(Coster, Abigail) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#35

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#13

#8

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance re: #8 Notice of Appearance. Document filed by Robert Weinstein..(Coster, Abigail) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase Stayed (ama) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING ACTION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that: The above-captioned action is hereby stayed pending further Order of the Court; After the lifting of the Stay, if any, the Parties will confer on a proposed schedule for Plaintiffs' remand motion and for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint; and, After the lifting of the Stay, if any, the Parties will also confer on a Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order in this action; and, IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that signatures via facsimile or email, and in counterpart, shall be deemed good and sufficient for all purposes, and that this Stipulation and Order may be electronically filed with the Clerk of Court without further notice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/29/2021) (ama) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, Jane Doe IV..(Merson, Jordan) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Disney Enterpries, Inc. answer due 4/1/2021; Miramax Film NY LLC answer due 4/1/2021; Miramax Holding Corp. answer due 4/1/2021; The Walt Disney Company answer due 4/1/2021; Harvey Weinstein answer due 4/1/2021; Robert Weinstein answer due 4/1/2021., Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 3/31/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (jwh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal #13 Motion to Remand to State Court: Plaintiffs' request to adjourn the January 27, 2021 initial conference is GRANTED. The initial conference is adjourned to March 31, 2021 at 9:30 am. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is extended from February 1, 2021 to April 1, 2021. Plaintiffs' motion to remand this action to state court, (ECF No. 13), is DENIED without prejudice to renew such motion upon completion of the parties' mediation and settlement discussions. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/19/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jordan Merson dated January 15, 2021 re: Request for Further Adjournment of Initial Pretrial Conference and Submission of Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, Jane Doe IV..(Merson, Jordan) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 1/27/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (va) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER: The initial conference and oral argument scheduled for January 20, 2021 are adjourned to January 27, 2021 at 10:30 am. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/14/2021) (va) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER: The initial conference and oral argument scheduled for December 9, 2020 are adjourned to January 20, 2021 at 10:30 am. The parties may submit a proposed case management plan after this Court decides the pending motion to remand, (ECF No. 13). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/3/2020) (ks)( Initial Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Giovanna Mabile Ferreira dos Santos on behalf of Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, Jane Doe IV..(Mabile Ferreira dos Santos, Giovanna) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Koel Merson on behalf of Jane Doe I, Jane Doe II, Jane Doe III, Jane Doe IV..(Merson, Jordan) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 950110/2020..Document filed by Robert Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Order to Show Cause, #3 Exhibit C-Attorney Affirmation in Support of Order to Show Cause, #4 Exhibit D Affidavit in Support of Order to Show Cause, #5 Exhibit E Affidavit in Support of Order to Show Cause, #6 Exhibit F-State Court Request for Judicial Intervention, #7 Exhibit G-State Court Order to Show Cause Scheduling Order, #8 Exhibit H-Service Affidavits, #9 Exhibit I-State Court Case Management Order No. 1, #10 Exhibit J-State Court Case Management Order No. 2, #11 Exhibit K-Service Affidavits).(Stein, Gary) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gary Stein to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment to the pleading must have a brief description in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. **DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS** (pne) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 17CV9554. (pne) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pne) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-9554 (AKH). Document filed by Robert Weinstein..(Stein, Gary) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Stein, Gary) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY LABELED - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 950110/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-20602458).Document filed by Robert Weinstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K).(Stein, Gary) Modified on 7/9/2020 (pne). (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miramax Holding Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Miramax Film NY LLC f/k/a Miramax Film Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Miramax Film Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Disney Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant