This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:51:46 (UTC).

DOE-GC v. City of Waller et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 DOE-GC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Waller. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JANE DOE-GC

Gracie Cates

Defendants

City of Waller

Waller County

John Michael Williams

William Llewellyn

Danny Marburger

Brian Dasher

Elton Mathis

Nanci Anderson

Matthew Samsel

Seth Samsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

U.A. Lewis

Attorney at The Lewis Law Group

P O Box 27353

Houston, TX 77227

Defendant Attorneys

Ramon G. Viada, III

Attorney at Viada & Strayer

17 Swallow Tail Ct

The Woodlands, TX 77381

Ricardo J. Navarro

Attorney at Denton Navarro Rocha Bernal & Zech, P.C.

701 E Harrison, Ste 100

Harlingen, TX 78550

Robert Lee Drinkard

Attorney at Denton Navarro Rocha Bernal PC

701 E Harrison Street, Ste 100

Harlingen, TX 78550

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Seth Samsel served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022, filed.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#21

(#21) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Seth Samsel served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022, filed.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#20

(#20) Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Gracie Cates, Jane Doe-GC.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#19

(#19) Summons Issued as to Seth Samsel. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#18

(#18) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jane Doe-GC, filed.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#17

(#17) Summons Issued as to Nanci Anderson,William Llewellyn, Brian David Dasher, Danny Marburger, Elton Raymond Mathis, Jr., Matthew Samsel, John Michael Williams. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

16 #16

Main Document

2 #1

Supplement

2 #2

Main Document

1 #6

Exhibit List of Attorneys & Parties

1 #5

Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit City of Waller's Original Answer

1 #3

Exhibit Waller Countys Original Answer

1 #2

Exhibit Citation on Waller County

1 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-83373 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27597752) filed by Waller County, City of Waller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Citation on Waller County, #3 Exhibit Waller Countys Original Answer, #4 Exhibit City of Waller's Original Answer, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit List of Attorneys & Parties)(Viada, Ramon) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Seth Samsel served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022, filed.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Seth Samsel served on 3/3/2022, answer due 3/24/2022, filed.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Gracie Cates, Jane Doe-GC.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Summons Issued as to Seth Samsel. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (BrandisIsom, 4) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jane Doe-GC, filed.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Summons Issued as to Nanci Anderson,William Llewellyn, Brian David Dasher, Danny Marburger, Elton Raymond Mathis, Jr., Matthew Samsel, John Michael Williams. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShannonHolden, 4) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Amended Complaint by Gracie Cates, Jane Doe-GC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) First AMENDED COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Gracie Cates, Jane Doe-GC.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jane Doe-GC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement)(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jane Doe-GC, filed.(Lewis, U.A.) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Judgment by Waller County, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Defendant Waller County's Motion for Judgement on the Pleadings)(Drinkard, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS Judgment by City of Waller, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Viada, Ramon) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by City of Waller, filed.(Viada, Ramon) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by City of Waller, filed.(Viada, Ramon) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 2/9/2022 at 03:50 PM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. A Zoom link will be provided. (leddins, 4) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Drinkard on behalf of Waller County, filed. (Drinkard, Robert) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo J. Navarro on behalf of Waller County, filed. (Navarro, Ricardo) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 2/11/2022 at 09:30 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provided. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-83373 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27597752) filed by Waller County, City of Waller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Citation on Waller County, #3 Exhibit Waller Countys Original Answer, #4 Exhibit City of Waller's Original Answer, #5 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit List of Attorneys & Parties)(Viada, Ramon) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walker County Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Lee Drinkard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ricardo J. Navarro

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramon Gustave Viada III