This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 07:28:27 (UTC).

DOE et al v. WOLF et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 DOE filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against WOLF. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CHAD F. KENNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02320

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHAD F. KENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEATHER DOE

JAMES DOE

BRENNAN DOE

LISA DOE

Defendants

PA EDUCATION SEC. PEDRO A. RIVERA

GOVERNOR THOMAS W. WOLF

PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES JOSEPH PEPPER

Attorney at THE PEPPER LAW FIRM, LLC

68 E. Court Street, Suite 2A

Doylestown, PA 18901

Defendant Attorneys

STEPHEN R. KOVATIS

Attorney at OFFICE OF ATTORNEY GENERAL

1600 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ELIZABETH A. ANZALONE

Attorney at PA DEPT OF EDUCATION

333 Market St

Harrisburg, PA 17126

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/10/20. 6/10/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(PEPPER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. ANZALONE on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA with Certificate of Service(ANZALONE, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. KOVATIS on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA, THOMAS W. WOLF with Certificate of Service(KOVATIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT, IN ORDER FOR THE COURT TO RULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION UNDER THE FACTS ALLEGED AND THE RELIEF REQUESTED, THE COURT WILL REQUIRE A PLEADING FROM DEFENDANTS AND A FULL SCHEDULING WITH OPPORTUNITY FOR BOTH SIDES TO BE FULLY HEARD AT EVERY STEP OF THE PROCESS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/28/20. 5/28/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MUST MEET AND CONFER REGARDING THE TIME AND STEPS THEY NEED TO RESPOND TO AND PREPARE FOR THE HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AS WELL AS COMPLETE THE HEARINGS, FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS (IF ANY), COMPLETE A RECORD FOR THE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE SOLE ISSUE OF THE INDIVIDUAL STUDENT-PLAINTIFFS' PARENTS' CLAIMS FOR RELIEF, RESPONSES, REPLIES, AND DATE(S) FOR THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/26/20. 5/26/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

3 #9

Exhibit

3 #8

Affidavit

3 #7

Affidavit

3 #6

Exhibit

3 #5

Exhibit

3 #4

Exhibit

3 #3

Exhibit

3 #2

Exhibit

3 #1

Affidavit

#3

(#3) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST DEFENDANTS filed by BRENNAN DOE, HEATHER DOE, JAMES DOE, LISA DOE.Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Exhibit)(PEPPER, JAMES) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/26/2020) (lvj, ). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES DOE, LISA DOE, HEATHER DOE, BRENNAN DOE. All Defendants served on 5/21/20 and answer 7/20/20. (PEPPER, JAMES) Modified on 5/26/2020 (lvj, ). (Entered: 05/23/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/10/20. 6/10/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(PEPPER, JAMES) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. ANZALONE on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA with Certificate of Service(ANZALONE, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN R. KOVATIS on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA, THOMAS W. WOLF with Certificate of Service(KOVATIS, STEPHEN) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT, IN ORDER FOR THE COURT TO RULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION UNDER THE FACTS ALLEGED AND THE RELIEF REQUESTED, THE COURT WILL REQUIRE A PLEADING FROM DEFENDANTS AND A FULL SCHEDULING WITH OPPORTUNITY FOR BOTH SIDES TO BE FULLY HEARD AT EVERY STEP OF THE PROCESS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/28/20. 5/28/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT THE PARTIES MUST MEET AND CONFER REGARDING THE TIME AND STEPS THEY NEED TO RESPOND TO AND PREPARE FOR THE HEARING ON THE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AS WELL AS COMPLETE THE HEARINGS, FILE A MOTION TO DISMISS (IF ANY), COMPLETE A RECORD FOR THE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE SOLE ISSUE OF THE INDIVIDUAL STUDENT-PLAINTIFFS' PARENTS' CLAIMS FOR RELIEF, RESPONSES, REPLIES, AND DATE(S) FOR THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING ON THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/26/20. 5/26/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AGAINST DEFENDANTS filed by BRENNAN DOE, HEATHER DOE, JAMES DOE, LISA DOE.Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Affidavit, #8 Affidavit, #9 Exhibit)(PEPPER, JAMES) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/26/2020) (lvj, ). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES DOE, LISA DOE, HEATHER DOE, BRENNAN DOE. All Defendants served on 5/21/20 and answer 7/20/20. (PEPPER, JAMES) Modified on 5/26/2020 (lvj, ). (Entered: 05/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, PEDRO A. RIVERA, THOMAS W. WOLF. Forwarded To: James Joseph Pepper on 5/18/20 (fdc, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14296923.), filed by JAMES DOE, LISA DOE, HEATHER DOE, BRENNAN DOE.(PEPPER, JAMES) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2020: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form) (lvj, ). (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen R. Kovatis Esq.