This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2020 at 11:17:08 (UTC).

Doe et al v. State of Maryland et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Maryland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02213

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jane Doe

Oxon Hill, MD 20745

Berri A. Wells

Oxon Hill, MD 20745

Defendants

Maryland Higher Education Commission

STATE OF MARYLAND

University of Maryland

University System of Maryland Board of Regents

University of Maryland Eastern Shore

Department of Budget & Management

Maryland State Department of Education

State of Maryland State Treasurer

Office for Civil Rights, Philadelphia Office

Dr. Prince Attoh

Jason Casares

U.S. Department of Justice

U.S. Department of Education

Ms. Cheryl Duffy

Dr. Joyce Bell

Dr. Boyd

University of MD-College Park

Office of the Secretary

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Raymond R Mulera

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

200 St. Paul Street, 17Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

Matthew A Haven

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

36 S. Charles Street, Suite 400

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

#20

19 #1

Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law

#18

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#17

2 #8

Exhibit F

2 #7

Exhibit E

2 #6

Exhibit D

2 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2B

1 #2

Exhibit 2A

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Plaintiff(s)/Debtors Demand for Trial by Jury and/or Request for Authorization and Order Pursuant to Rule 607-Alternative Dispute Resolution, Jointly by Berri A. Wells (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #17 State Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #18 Federal Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; denying #21 Plaintiff's notice, construed as a Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/18/2020. (c/m 09/21/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/21/2020 (ols, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE Amended Entry of Default with Affidavit for Entry of Default by Berri A. Wells (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Berri A. Wells (c/m 09/15/2020 ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative for a More Definite Statement by Associate Director of Career and Workplace Education, Prince Attoh, Joyce Bell, Boyd, Jason Casares, Department of Budget & Management, Cheryl Duffy, LaKeisha Harris, Larry Hogan, MD General Assembly/ MD House Speaker, Maryland Higher Education Commission, Office of the President UMES/ED HBCU, Office of the Secretary, State of Maryland, State of Maryland State Treasurer, State of Maryland University of MD College Park, Marshall Stevenson, University System of Maryland Board of Regents, University of MD-College Park(Office of Civil Rights & Sexual Misconduct), University of MD-College Park(Ombudsman Officer Hon. Mark A. Shayman), University of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Office for Civil Rights, Philadelphia Office, U.S. Department of Education, U.S. Department of Justice(Haven, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Associate Director of Career and Workplace Education, Department of Budget & Management, Maryland Higher Education Commission, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, State of Maryland, State of Maryland State Treasurer, State of Maryland University of MD College Park, University System of Maryland Board of Regents, University of MD-College Park(Office of Civil Rights & Sexual Misconduct), University of MD-College Park(Ombudsman Officer Hon. Mark A. Shayman), University of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Office of the Secretary (Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by State of Maryland State Treasurer (Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by University System of Maryland Board of Regents (Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Department of Budget & Management (Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Associate Director of Career and Workplace Education (Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of filing of state court material by Jane Doe, Jane Doe, Berri A. Wells (Attachments: #1 State Affidavit and Service of Summons) (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Associate Director of Career and Workplace Education, Department of Budget & Management, MD General Assembly/ MD House Speaker, Maryland Higher Education Commission, Office of the President UMES/ED HBCU, Office of the Secretary, State of Maryland, State of Maryland State Treasurer, State of Maryland University of MD College Park, University System of Maryland Board of Regents, University of MD-College Park(Office of Civil Rights & Sexual Misconduct), University of MD-College Park(Ombudsman Officer Hon. Mark A. Shayman), University of Maryland re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correspondence from Clerk re: Removal Notification Letter (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Department of Budget & Management, State of Maryland, Associate Director of Career and Workplace Education, University System of Maryland Board of Regents, Maryland Higher Education Commission, Office of the Secretary, University of Maryland was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Notice of Removal. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR SOMERSET COUNTY. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Associate Director of Career and Workplace Education, Department of Budget & Management, Larry Hogan, MD General Assembly/ MD House Speaker, Maryland Higher Education Commission, Office of the President UMES/ED HBCU, Office of the Secretary, State of Maryland, State of Maryland State Treasurer, State of Maryland University of MD College Park, University System of Maryland Board of Regents, University of MD-College Park(Office of Civil Rights & Sexual Misconduct), University of MD-College Park(Ombudsman Officer Hon. Mark A. Shayman), University of Maryland. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Berri A. Wells. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Information Report, #2 Exhibits Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z, #30 Exhibit AA, #31 Exhibit BB, #32 Exhibit CC, #33 Exhibit DD) (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Somerset County, case number C-19-cv-20-000089. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8780751), filed by Maryland Higher Education Commission, STATE OF MARYLAND, Maryland Higher Education Commission, University of Maryland Eastern Shore, Maryland State Department of Education, University of Maryland, Department of Budget & Management, University System of Maryland Board of Regents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 3)(Mulera, Raymond) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Maryland is a litigant

Latest cases where Maryland State Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases where Boyd Aao 3944 Deep Passage Llc, James M is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Department of Education is a litigant