This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2020 at 11:44:02 (UTC).

Doe et al v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 Doe filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02274

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Doe

Howard Lee Davis

Defendants

EFI Global

Dawana Owens

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alexander Gray Hait

Ralph J. Villani

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah Louise Bright

Kent Taylor Stair

Tawny D. Mack

Mark Thomas Dietrichs

Sean Patrick Farrell

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Appendix (Proposed) Amended Complaint

#15

#14

#12

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Certificate

1 #1

Exhibit A - Lower Court Documents

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to File Amended Complaint EFI Global, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to File Amended Complaint filed by EFI Global. (Bright, Sarah) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE re #15 MOTION to File Amended Complaint filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Dawana Owens. (Farrell, Sean) Modified on 7/13/2020 to add filer (bnp). (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER, by docket entry only, granting #16 Motion to Stay proceedings until Motion to Remand is ruled upon by the Court. By Judge Amy Totenberg on 7/6/20. (hfm) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #16 Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings until Motion to Remand is ruled upon by the Court to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Joint MOTION to Stay proceedings until Motion to Remand is ruled upon by the Court with Brief In Support by Howard Lee Davis, John Doe. (Villani, Ralph) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to File Amended Complaint in lieu of Responding to Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages, #12 Reply to Response to Motion, #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1 Notice of Removal, #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with (Proposed) Amended Complaint Attached with Brief In Support by Howard Lee Davis, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Proposed) Amended Complaint)(Villani, Ralph) Modified on 7/1/2020 to edit event text (bnp). (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (bnp) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages filed by Howard Lee Davis, John Doe. (Villani, Ralph) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Remand to State Court with Brief In Support by Howard Lee Davis, John Doe. (Villani, Ralph) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages with Brief In Support by EFI Global. (Attachments: #1 Brief EFI Global, Inc.'s Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages)(Mack, Tawny) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EFI Global, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by EFI Global.(Mack, Tawny) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Dietrichs, Mark) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 6/1/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Dawana Owens identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Bank, FSB, Other Affiliate State Farm Florida Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Oglesby Reinsurance Company, Other Affiliate Top Layer Reinsurance, Ltd., Other Affiliate State Farm Companies Foundation, Other Affiliate Insurance Placement Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm International Services, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Finance Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate SF Insurance Placement Corporation of Canada, Other Affiliate Idaho Pacific, LLC, Other Affiliate MICP, LLC, Other Affiliate SFCL, LLC, Other Affiliate SASAP, LLC, Other Affiliate MountainBrook, LLC, Other Affiliate Hoover Ross Bridge, LLC, Other Affiliate SF Risk Management Group, LLC, Other Affiliate SRL Portfolio, LLC, Other Affiliate 4eightyfive, LLC, Other Affiliate RS Realty, LLC, Other Affiliate New Jersey Kimball, LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments One, LP, Other Affiliate BCS West Land Investments, LP, Other Affiliate St. Louis Market, LLC, Other Affiliate Town Square Retail, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Tempe Office Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlanta Office Ph I, LLC, Other Affiliate EMVLP, LLC, Other Affiliate Austin Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack II, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Mac Jack, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack IV, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Jack V, LLC, Other Affiliate Centennial Park III, LLC, Other Affiliate Idaho - Brockton, LP, Other Affiliate City Lights on Fig, LP, Other Affiliate SFSV Hill Airport Commerce, LP, Other Affiliate DRT, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm Realty Investment Company, Other Affiliate State Farm International Holding Company, Other Affiliate Foreign Securities Trust No. 1, Other Affiliate State Farm EM Equity Trust, Other Affiliate State Farm Lloyds, Inc., Other Affiliate State Farm Liquidity Pool LLC, Other Affiliate BCS Office Investments Two, LP, Other Affiliate State Farm County Mutual Insurance Company of Texas, Other Affiliate State Farm Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Life and Accident Assurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Investment Management Corp., Other Affiliate State Farm Equity and Bond Fund (Symbol: SLBAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Equity Fund (Symbol: SFFAX), Other Affiliate State Farm International Index Fund (Symbol: SIIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small Cap Index Fund (Symbol: SMIAX), Other Affiliate State Farm Small/Mid Cap Equity Fund (Symbol: SFSAX), Other Affiliate Durham Office Headquarters Buildngs, LLC, Other Affiliate State Farm General Insurance Company, Other Affiliate State Farm Fire and Casualty Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Farrell, Sean) Modified on 6/2/2020 to add filer (jpa). (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/26/2020. (adg) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Dawana Owens. Discovery ends on 10/26/2020.(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT, filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Dawana Owens. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGANDC-9743621) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lower Court Documents, #2 Certificate, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(adg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less