This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2021 at 09:04:49 (UTC).

Doe et al v. Olson et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Doe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Olson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Willie J. Epps, Jr and Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04102

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Willie J. Epps, Jr

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jane Doe

John Doe

S.M

J.G.

C.C.

H.P.S

H.W.S

E.R.

G.R.

K.P.

S.P.

S.C.L.R.

H.P.S.

H.W.S.

Petitioners

Jane Doe (1-10)

John Does 1-15

Defendants

Christopher S. Jolly

Eric T Olson

Missouri State Highway Patrol

David A. Flannigan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clifford Cornell

Attorney at Cornell Farrow Healea, LLC

1739 E Elm, Suite 103

Jefferson City, MO 65101

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

4 #1

MAP General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a previously filed related case, this case is reassigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Beth Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number should reflect the change in judge assignment: 2:21-04102-CV-C-BP. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docket(#2) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 5/12/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Karp, Beth) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants filed by Clifford Cornell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7414248. Service due by 8/10/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, Clifford) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G.R. is a litigant

Latest cases where Missouri State Highway Patrol is a litigant

Latest cases where K.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where J.G. is a litigant