This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2020 at 08:17:59 (UTC).

Doe, et. al. v. Newton Public Schools, et. al.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 Doe filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Newton Public Schools. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are Allison D. Burroughs and Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-12293

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Allison D. Burroughs

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Doe

Jane Doe

John Doe

Defendants

Bureau of Special Education Appeals

Newton Public Schools

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eileen M. Hagerty

Attorney at Kotin, Crabtree and Strong, LLP

One Bowdoin Square, 8Th Fl.

Boston, MA 02114

Defendant Attorneys

Laronica K. Lightfoot

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

One Ashburton Place

Boston, MA 02108

Jill M. Murray

Attorney at City of Newton

1000 Commonweatlh Ave

Newton, MA 02459

Carolyn A. Weisman

Attorney at Law Department

1000 Commonwealth Avenue

Newton, MA 02459

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) First CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#20

(#20) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Hagerty, Eileen) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#18

(#18) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 23, 2019 to File Answer by Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Laronica K. Lightfoot on behalf of Bureau of Special Education Appeals (Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#14

(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed Bureau of Special Education Appeals served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed Newton Public Schools served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn A. Weisman on behalf of Newton Public Schools (Weisman, Carolyn) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Newton Public Schools.(Murray, Jill) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

(#7) Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#5

(#5) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Newton Public Schools. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint

1 #2

Category Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) First CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (Hagerty, Eileen) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 23, 2019 to File Answer by Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bureau of Special Education Appeals.(Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Laronica K. Lightfoot on behalf of Bureau of Special Education Appeals (Lightfoot, Laronica) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • (#15) NOTICE OF CORRECTION TO DOCKET MADE BY COURT STAFF. Correction: Dkt. Nos 11 and 12 corrected because: The incorrect event was used to docket return of summons. Each summons has been re-docketed correctly. Dkt. Nos 11 and 12 should be disregarded in its entirety. Counsel is reminded to review local rules and the attorney handbook when filing documents with the Court. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed Bureau of Special Education Appeals served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed Newton Public Schools served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • (#12) DISREGARD: Notice of Service of Process filed by David Doe, John Doe, Jane Doe. Individual(s)/Entities served: Newton Public Schools. (Hagerty, Eileen) Modified on 12/12/2019 (Lara, Miguel). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn A. Weisman on behalf of Newton Public Schools (Weisman, Carolyn) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Scheduling Conference.... Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Chief Judge Patti B. Saris. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Newton Public Schools.(Murray, Jill) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Document ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris added. Judge Allison D. Burroughs no longer assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER OF RECUSAL.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Bureau of Special Education Appeals, Newton Public Schools. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Kelly, Danielle) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to File Anonymously and to Seal Record by David Doe, John Doe, Jane Doe.(Hagerty, Eileen) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Newton Public Schools and Bureau of Special Education of Appeals Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7961101 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John Doe, David Doe, Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Hagerty, Eileen) Modified on 11/7/2019 to correct docket text(Kelly, Danielle). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWTON PUBLIC SCHOOLS is a litigant

Latest cases where Bureau Of Special Education Appeals Of Massachusetts is a litigant