This case was last updated from PACER on 06/13/2021 at 13:40:19 (UTC).

Doe #46 v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Doe 46 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank W. Volk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank W. Volk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Doe #46

Defendant

The United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen P. New

P. O. Box 5516

Beckley, WV 25801

Amanda J. Taylor

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF STEPHEN P. NEW

P. O. Box 5516

Beckley, WV 25801

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER directing that the actions listed herein be provisionally CONSOLIDATED pending further Order of the Court; designating 5:20-cv-000806 as the lead case and directing that all further filings be made in the lead case, as more fully described herein. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 4/22/2021. (cc: counsel of record) (msa)

5 #2

Summons - Veterans Affairs

5 #1

Summons - U.S. Attorney General

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons - Veterans Affairs) (btm)

4 #2

Proposed Summons

4 #1

Proposed Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by John Doe #46 for United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(New, Stephen) (Modified on 4/15/2021 to remove and replace images that were not flattened)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (msa)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons- USA

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7924735. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons- USA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCASES ASSOCIATED: Create association to 5:20-cv-00806. (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketAS OF 4/22/2021, THE FOLLOWING ADDITIONAL CASES HAVE BEEN CONSOLIDATED: 5:20-cv-806; 5:21-cv-223; 5:21-cv-224; 5:20-cv-225; 5:21-cv-226; 5:21-cv-227; 5:21-cv-228; 5:21-cv-229; 5:21-cv-230; 5:21-cv-231; 5:21-cv-232; 5:21-cv-233; 5:21-cv-234. ALL FURTHER ENTRIES SHALL BE DOCKETED IN LEAD CASE NO. 5:20-cv-806. (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing that the actions listed herein be provisionally CONSOLIDATED pending further Order of the Court; designating 5:20-cv-000806 as the lead case and directing that all further filings be made in the lead case, as more fully described herein. Signed by Judge Frank W. Volk on 4/22/2021. (cc: counsel of record) (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by John Doe #46 for United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. ERROR: Images were not flattened. CORRECTION: Flattened and replaced images. (slr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons - Veterans Affairs) (btm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Frank W. Volk. (klc) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by John Doe #46 for United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(New, Stephen) (Modified on 4/15/2021 to remove and replace images that were not flattened)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7924735. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons- USA, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (msa)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda J. Taylor