This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:45:35 (UTC).

Doe 304 v. Richter et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Doe 304 filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Richter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard M Gergel and Sherri A Lydon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03409

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Richard M Gergel

Sherri A Lydon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe 304

Defendants

Bishop of Charleston, The

David K Haller

Robert E Guglielmone

Lawrence E Richter, Jr

Richter & Haller LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregg Meyers

Attorney at Gregg Meyers Law Firm

217 Lucas Street, Box 10

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorneys

Richard S Dukes, Jr

Attorney at Turner Padget Graham and Laney

Po Box 22129

Charleston, SC 29413-2129

Susan Taylor Wall

Attorney at Gordon and Rees LLP

40 Calhoun Street, Suite 350

Charleston, SC 29401

Benjamin Clement Bruner

Attorney at Bruner Powell Wall and Mullins LLC

Po Box 61110

Columbia, SC 29260

Chelsea Jaqueline Clark

Attorney at Bruner Powell Wall and Mullins LLC

Po Box 61110

Columbia, SC 29260

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Support. Re: #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . Response filed by Bishop of Charleston, The, Robert E Guglielmone. (Dukes, Richard) Modified on 01/17/2020 to correct event type. (lsut, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Stay by Richter & Haller LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bruner, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Clement Bruner on behalf of Lawrence E Richter, Jr, Richter & Haller LLC (Bruner, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Jaqueline Clark on behalf of Lawrence E Richter, Jr, Richter & Haller LLC (Clark, Chelsea) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

5 #13

Exhibit E - Order on Lawyer Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment

5 #12

Exhibit D (9 of 9) - Complaints

5 #11

Exhibit D (8 of 9) - Complaints

5 #10

Exhibit D (7 of 9) - Complaints

5 #9

Exhibit D (6 of 9) - Complaints

5 #8

Exhibit D (5 of 9) - Complaints

5 #7

Exhibit D (4 of 9) - Complaints

5 #6

Exhibit D (3 of 9) - Complaints

5 #5

Exhibit D (2 of 9) - Complaints

5 #4

Exhibit D (1 of 9) - Complaints

5 #3

Exhibit C - Final Joint Brief of Respondents

5 #2

Exhibit B - Order - The Honorable C. Weston Houck

5 #1

Exhibit A - Order Approving Settlement

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by David K Haller. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Approving Settlement, #2 Exhibit B - Order - The Honorable C. Weston Houck, #3 Exhibit C - Final Joint Brief of Respondents, #4 Exhibit D (1 of 9) - Complaints, #5 Exhibit D (2 of 9) - Complaints, #6 Exhibit D (3 of 9) - Complaints, #7 Exhibit D (4 of 9) - Complaints, #8 Exhibit D (5 of 9) - Complaints, #9 Exhibit D (6 of 9) - Complaints, #10 Exhibit D (7 of 9) - Complaints, #11 Exhibit D (8 of 9) - Complaints, #12 Exhibit D (9 of 9) - Complaints, #13 Exhibit E - Order on Lawyer Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment)No proposed order.(Wall, Susan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Support. Re: #5 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court . Response filed by Bishop of Charleston, The, Robert E Guglielmone. (Dukes, Richard) Modified on 01/17/2020 to correct event type. (lsut, ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Stay by Richter & Haller LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Bruner, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#8) Case Reassigned to Judge Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Clement Bruner on behalf of Lawrence E Richter, Jr, Richter & Haller LLC (Bruner, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Jaqueline Clark on behalf of Lawrence E Richter, Jr, Richter & Haller LLC (Clark, Chelsea) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by David K Haller. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Approving Settlement, #2 Exhibit B - Order - The Honorable C. Weston Houck, #3 Exhibit C - Final Joint Brief of Respondents, #4 Exhibit D (1 of 9) - Complaints, #5 Exhibit D (2 of 9) - Complaints, #6 Exhibit D (3 of 9) - Complaints, #7 Exhibit D (4 of 9) - Complaints, #8 Exhibit D (5 of 9) - Complaints, #9 Exhibit D (6 of 9) - Complaints, #10 Exhibit D (7 of 9) - Complaints, #11 Exhibit D (8 of 9) - Complaints, #12 Exhibit D (9 of 9) - Complaints, #13 Exhibit E - Order on Lawyer Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment)No proposed order.(Wall, Susan) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jane Doe 304. Service due by 3/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Expert affidavit) (Meyers, Gregg) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bishop of Charleston, The, Robert E Guglielmone.(sshe, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-10-5892. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8814405), filed by Robert E Guglielmone, Bishop of Charleston, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B Declaration of Richard Dukes, #3 Supporting Documents Letter to Counsel Serving Removal, #4 Certificate of Service)(sshe, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.