This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:25:52 (UTC).

Doe 24 et al v. Michigan State University et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Doe 24 filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan State University. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon J. Quist and Ellen S. Carmody. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00440

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon J. Quist

Referral Judge

Ellen S. Carmody

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jane Does 24 and 25

Jane Doe 24

Claire Brenton-Miller

Grand Ledge, MI 48837

Jane Doe 25

Defendants

Michigan State Board of Trustees

Michigan State University

Kathie Klages

Jeffrey R. Kovan

William D. Strampel

Brooke Lemmen

Gary E. Stollak

Lawrence Gerard Nassar

Douglas Dietzel

Destiny Teachnor-Hauk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan Anne Bonanni

Attorney at Pitt McGehee Palmer & Rivers PC

117 W Fourth St., Ste. 200

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Michael L. Pitt

Attorney at Pitt McGehee Palmer & Rivers PC

117 W Fourth St., Ste. 200

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Beth M. Rivers

Attorney at Pitt McGehee Palmer & Rivers PC

117 W Fourth St., Ste. 200

Royal Oak, MI 48067

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew M. Gonyea

Attorney at Hickey Hauck Bishoff & Jeffers, PLLC

One Woodward Ave., Ste. 2000

Detroit, MI 48226

Ashley Evaline Racette

Attorney at Kerr Russell & Weber PLC

500 Woodward Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-3427

Daniel J. Ferris

Attorney at Kerr Russell & Weber PLC

500 Woodward Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-3427

Fred K. Herrmann

Attorney at Kerr Russell & Weber PLC

500 Woodward Ave., Ste. 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-3427

 

Court Documents

#1

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#9) ORDER granting #3 motion to consolidate cases; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to consolidate cases #3 filed by Jane Does 24 and 25 (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is cognate to 1:17-cv-29 (jlb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (ns) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State Board of Trustees, Michigan State University, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk (ns) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER regarding CONSOLIDATING CASES by plaintiffs Jane Doe 24, Jane Doe 25 [Attorney Megan Anne Bonanni added to party Jane Doe 25(pty:pla)] (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #3 motion to consolidate cases; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#52

(#52) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order Voluntary Dismissal MOTION to dismiss (1149 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 1149 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

51 #1

Attachment certificate of concurrence

51 #1184

(#51) FIRST MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-998) by plaintiff Claire Brenton-Miller (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of concurrence); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zoglio, David) Modified text on 8/5/2019 (mg). (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#50

(#50) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants(1182 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B57NF Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

49 #1

Proposed Order

49 #1182

(#49) MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants by plaintiff Jane B57NF Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#48

(#48) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1179 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Kylie Dickman; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#47

(#47) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Kylie Dickman re MOTION to dismiss (1179 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

46 #1179

(#46) MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Kylie Dickman; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order Voluntary Dismissal MOTION to dismiss (1149 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC, 1149 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B. Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Behm, Thomas) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Remark from Clerk's Office: counsel should contact the case administrator for these cases at (269) 337-5706 in advance of adding/modifying any parties, as well as for other e-filing questions associated with these cases ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (mg) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) FIRST MOTION to dismiss (re 1:18-cv-998) by plaintiff Claire Brenton-Miller (Attachments: #1 Attachment certificate of concurrence); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Zoglio, David) Modified text on 8/5/2019 (mg). (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants(1182 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Jane B57NF Doe; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) MOTION to dismiss with Prejudice of Claims Against MSU Defendants by plaintiff Jane B57NF Doe; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Grewal, Manvir) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss (1179 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) filed by Kylie Dickman; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Kylie Dickman re MOTION to dismiss (1179 in 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC) ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) MOTION to dismiss by plaintiff Kylie Dickman; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order); this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Cascarilla, Richard) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER granting (1166) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER granting (1162) motion to dismiss in case 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist ; this document appears in the following associated cases: 1:17-cv-00029-GJQ-ESC et al. (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #3 motion to consolidate cases; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROPOSED ORDER regarding CONSOLIDATING CASES by plaintiffs Jane Doe 24, Jane Doe 25 [Attorney Megan Anne Bonanni added to party Jane Doe 25(pty:pla)] (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Douglas Dietzel, Kathie Klages, Jeffrey R. Kovan, Brooke Lemmen, Michigan State Board of Trustees, Michigan State University, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, Gary E. Stollak, William D. Strampel, Destiny Teachnor-Hauk (ns) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (ns) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is cognate to 1:17-cv-29 (jlb) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to consolidate cases #3 filed by Jane Does 24 and 25 (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to consolidate cases by plaintiff Jane Does 24 and 25; (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jane Does 24 and 25 in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4456164 (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Jane Does 24 and 25 (Bonanni, Megan) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.