This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:53:30 (UTC).

Doe v. Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Doe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carmen E. Garza and Gregory J. Fouratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00460

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carmen E. Garza

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jane Doe 2

Jane Doe

Defendants

The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero

Eric Scott Kindley

Mason, TN 38049

Otero County Detention Center

Otero County Sheriff Benny House

Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero

Carolyn Barela

Benny House

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Maggie H Lane

Attorney at Rothstein Donatelli LLP

500 4Th Street Nw, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Carolyn M. Nichols

Attorney at Rothstein Donatelli LLP

500 4Th St. Nw, Suite 400

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

James P Sullivan

Attorney at Brennan & Sullivan, P.A.

128 East Devargas

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Christina L Brennan

Attorney at Brennan & Sullivan PA

128 East Devargas

Santa Fe, NM 87501

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Eric Scott Kindley Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Jane Doe.(vh) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a Settlement Conference for 9/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Carolyn Barela, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero, Benny House (Notice of Agreed Extension of Time for County Defendants to File Answer) (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L Brennan on behalf of Carolyn Barela, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero, Benny House (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by James P Sullivan on behalf of Carolyn Barela, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero, Benny House (Sullivan, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS AND TORTIOUS CONDUCT against Eric Scott Kindley, Otero County Detention Center, Otero County Sheriff Benny House, The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lane, Maggie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Eric Scott Kindley Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Jane Doe.(vh) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing setting a Settlement Conference for 9/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 480 Chama Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. (cda) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Summons Issued as to Eric Scott Kindley. (khs) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Carolyn Barela, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero, Benny House (Notice of Agreed Extension of Time for County Defendants to File Answer) (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L Brennan on behalf of Carolyn Barela, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero, Benny House (Brennan, Christina) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by James P Sullivan on behalf of Carolyn Barela, Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero, Benny House (Sullivan, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#3) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (ln) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces) (Otero County). (ln) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6437257 re #1 Complaint, filed by Jane Doe 2 (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lane, Maggie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR CIVIL RIGHTS VIOLATIONS AND TORTIOUS CONDUCT against Eric Scott Kindley, Otero County Detention Center, Otero County Sheriff Benny House, The Board of County Commissioners for the County of Otero ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jane Doe 2. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lane, Maggie) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.