This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 05:50:58 (UTC).

DOE (1968-1990) v. University of Michigan et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 DOE 1968-1990 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against University of Michigan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are George Caram Steeh, David R. Grand, Victoria A. Roberts and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10134

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

George Caram Steeh

Victoria A. Roberts

Referral Judges

David R. Grand

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN DOE (1968-1990)

Defendants

University of Michigan

Regents of the University of Michigan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Darryl W. Eason

4952 Dewitt Road

Canton, MI 48188

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by JOHN DOE (1968-1990) against Regents of the University of Michigan, University of Michigan with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8764579 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Eason, Darryl) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Regents of the University of Michigan* (DAll) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *University of Michigan* (DAll) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#4

(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to All Defendants . (Eason, Darryl)[WAIVERS RETURNED EXECUTED AS TO DEFENDANTS] Modified on 4/18/2022 (DPer). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Eason, Darryl) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Eason, Darryl) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge George Caram Steeh and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted as to All Defendants . (Eason, Darryl)[WAIVERS RETURNED EXECUTED AS TO DEFENDANTS] Modified on 4/18/2022 (DPer). (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *University of Michigan* (DAll) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Regents of the University of Michigan* (DAll) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by JOHN DOE (1968-1990) against Regents of the University of Michigan, University of Michigan with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8764579 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Eason, Darryl) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The University of Michigan is a litigant

Latest cases where The Regents Of The University Of Michigan is a litigant