This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 08:37:03 (UTC).

Doe 1 et al v. National Collegiate Athletic Association et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 Doe 1 filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against National Collegiate Athletic Association. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01559

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

John Doe 1

John Doe 2

John Doe 3

Defendants

Anthony N. Giarratano

National Collegiate Athletic Association

University of San Francisco

Nino Giarratano

Troy Nakamura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan David Selbin

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 30Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3336

Elizabeth A. Fegan

Attorney at Fegan Scott LLC

150 S. Wacker Dr., 24Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Lynn Ellenberger

Attorney at Fegan Scott LLC

500 Grant Street, Suite 2900

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Michelle A. Lamy

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann Bernstein LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nigar Shaikh

Attorney at Lieff Cabraser Heimann and Bernstein, LLP

275 Battery Street, 29Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel A. Croley

Attorney at Futterman Dupree Dodd Croley Maier LLP

601 Montgomery St., Suite 333

San Francisco, CA 94111

Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke

Attorney at Munger, Tolles Olson LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

April D. Youpee-Roll

Attorney at Munger, Tolles and Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ariel Tal Teshuva

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brandon E. Martinez

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Hailyn Jennifer Chen

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ANTHONY NINO GIARRATANO TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Anthony N. Giarratano. (Croley, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2022) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#30

(#30) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Collegiate Athletic Association.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#29

(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon E. Martinez as Counsel for Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association (Martinez, Brandon) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#28

(#28) STIPULATION Regarding Defendant The University of San Francisco's Deadline to Respond to Forthcoming First Amended Complaint filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#27

(#27) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Hailyn Jennifer Chen as Counsel for Defendant the National Collegiate Athletic Association (Chen, Hailyn) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel Tal Teshuva as Counsel for Defendant the National Collegiate Athletic Association (Teshuva, Ariel) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by April D. Youpee-Roll as Counsel for Defendant the National Collegiate Athletic Association (Youpee-Roll, April) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#23

(#23) STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FORTHCOMING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#9

(#9) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan representing Plaintiffs. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#8

(#10) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Lynn Ellenberger representing Plaintiffs. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#7

(#9) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan representing Plaintiffs. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Anthony N. Giarratano, Troy Nakamura, National Collegiate Athletic Association, University of San Francisco. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2022 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ANTHONY NINO GIARRATANO TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Anthony N. Giarratano. (Croley, Daniel) (Filed on 5/9/2022) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Collegiate Athletic Association.. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/26/2022) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon E. Martinez as Counsel for Defendant The National Collegiate Athletic Association (Martinez, Brandon) (Filed on 4/19/2022) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) STIPULATION Regarding Defendant The University of San Francisco's Deadline to Respond to Forthcoming First Amended Complaint filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/14/2022) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/27/2022. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2022) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Hailyn Jennifer Chen as Counsel for Defendant the National Collegiate Athletic Association (Chen, Hailyn) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel Tal Teshuva as Counsel for Defendant the National Collegiate Athletic Association (Teshuva, Ariel) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by April D. Youpee-Roll as Counsel for Defendant the National Collegiate Athletic Association (Youpee-Roll, April) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FORTHCOMING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Certificate of Interested Entities by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Lynn Ellenberger representing Plaintiffs. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elizabeth A. Fegan representing Plaintiffs. (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Lynn Ellenberger ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16989463.) filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3. (Ellenberger, Lynn) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth A. Fegan ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16989302.) filed by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3. (Fegan, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Anthony N. Giarratano, Troy Nakamura, National Collegiate Athletic Association, University of San Francisco. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2022 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16984202.). Filed byJohn Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Selbin, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/11/2022) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSITY OF SAN FRANCISCO is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHELLE LAMY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn Ellenberger