This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:11:24 (UTC).

Dodson v. National Money Man 4 Cash Advance, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Dodson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against National Money Man 4 Cash Advance, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven C. Seeger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07984

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven C. Seeger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sarah Dodson

Defendants

National Money Man 4 Cash Advance, LLC

John F. Guillory

JJ Guillory

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Jacob Wood

Attorney at Community Lawyers Group, Ltd.

20 North Clark Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Celetha Chatman

Attorney at Community Lawyers Group, Ltd.

20 North Clark Street, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60602

Michael William Drew

Attorney at Neighborhood Legal, Llc

20 N. Clark, Ste. 3300

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Pursuant to the Court's Order (Dckt. No. #8 ), Defendants have not been served with process therefore the initial status hearing set for February 5, 2020 is stricken and reset for February 20, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for February 6, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Report" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by February 3, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) FIRST AMENDED complaint by Sarah Dodson against All Defendants (Drew, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sarah Dodson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16504595. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#7

(#7) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Sarah Dodson Redline Version regarding amended complaint #6 (Drew, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sarah Dodson by Michael William Drew (Drew, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sarah Dodson by Celetha Chatman (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sarah Dodson by Michael Jacob Wood (Wood, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Pursuant to the Court's Order (Dckt. No. #8 ), Defendants have not been served with process therefore the initial status hearing set for February 5, 2020 is stricken and reset for February 20, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status hearing is set for February 6, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Report" on the Court's website. At least two weeks before the hearing, the parties must discuss settlement in good faith, and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court before the initial status hearing. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) by February 3, 2020. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Please note that the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report on the Court's docket, but must email (i.e., not file on the docket) the proposed Scheduling Order to the Court's proposed order inbox. The initial status hearing will be the scheduling conference contemplated by Rule 16(b). Lead counsel for the parties must participate in the initial status conference. Counsel must be prepared to discuss the status of settlement, as well as the proposed discovery plan. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process by one week before the initial status hearing, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status hearing. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. Mailed notice. (jjr, ) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant John F. Guillory (txl, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Sarah Dodson Redline Version regarding amended complaint #6 (Drew, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AMENDED complaint by Sarah Dodson against All Defendants (Drew, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant National Money Man 4 Cash Advance, LLC (daj, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sarah Dodson by Michael William Drew (Drew, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sarah Dodson by Celetha Chatman (Chatman, Celetha) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sarah Dodson by Michael Jacob Wood (Wood, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sarah Dodson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16504595. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Michael) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.