This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:38:13 (UTC).

DOCK Management Inc v. Granite State Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 DOCK Management Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Granite State Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo S. Martinez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01563

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo S. Martinez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

D.O.C.K. Management, Inc.

DOCK Management Inc doing business as Ford-Hyundai of Kirkland

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Granite State Insurance Company

Does 1-20

Counter Defendant

DOCK Management Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Justin T Jastrzebski

Attorney at AFRCT, LLP (SEATTLE)

701 Pike Street, Suite 1560

Seattle, WA 98101

Robert A. Bailey

Attorney at AFRCT, LLP (PASADENA)

301 N Lake Ave Ste 1100

Pasadena, CA 91101-4158

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Michael Edward Ricketts

Attorney at GORDON THOMAS HONEYWELL (SEA)

520 Pike St Ste 2350

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint; & Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against plaintiff DOCK Management Inc by Granite State Insurance Company.(Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

7 #4

Attachment 4

7 #3

Attachment 3

7 #2

Attachment 2

7 #1

Attachment 1

#7

(#7) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Granite State Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4)(Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/10/2020, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DOCK Management Inc (Bailey, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Granite State Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Granite State Insurance Company (Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#3

(#3) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant Granite State Insurance Company. (Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #1

Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-13230-6 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6688190) Attorney Michael Edward Ricketts added to party Granite State Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Granite State Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint; & Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief against plaintiff DOCK Management Inc by Granite State Insurance Company.(Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Granite State Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4)(Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/10/2020, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LC) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DOCK Management Inc (Bailey, Robert) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for Granite State Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Granite State Insurance Company (Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff and Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/2/2020. (CDA) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketJudge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant Granite State Insurance Company. (Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-13230-6 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6688190) Attorney Michael Edward Ricketts added to party Granite State Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Granite State Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less