This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 07:10:07 (UTC).

DOBSON v. RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 DOBSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02061

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LARRY DOBSON

Defendant

RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A SHORE PC

Two Penn Center Suite 1240, 1500 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Defendant Attorney

JO BENNETT

Attorney at SCHNADER HARRISON SEGAL & LEWIS LLP

1600 Market Street, Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT. (BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/6/2021 10:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/10/21. 6/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT.(BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JO BENNETT on behalf of RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT (BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARRY DOBSON. RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

#3

(#3) EXHIBIT to Complaint by LARRY DOBSON.. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/21/21. 5/21/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

1 #3

Designation Form Designation Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15099762.), filed by LARRY DOBSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form Designation Form)(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT. (BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/6/2021 10:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 6/10/21. 6/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT.(BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by JO BENNETT on behalf of RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT (BENNETT, JO) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LARRY DOBSON. RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) EXHIBIT to Complaint by LARRY DOBSON.. (LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE HENRY S. PERKIN; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/21/21. 5/21/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 5/5/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAttorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file a completed Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (md, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by LARRY DOBSON. (md, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15099762.), filed by LARRY DOBSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form Designation Form)(LEMIEUX-FILLERY, MARY) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESOURCES FOR HUMAN DEVELOPMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARY E. LEMIEUX-FILLERY