This case was last updated from PACER on 03/21/2021 at 07:16:24 (UTC).

Dobson Mills Apartments, L.P. et al v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Dobson Mills Apartments, L P filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. CURTIS JOYNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00273

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. CURTIS JOYNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dobson Mills Apartments, L.P.

Mansion at Bala, L.P.

Dobson Scotts, L.P.

Defendants

CITY OF PHILADELPHIA

Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAM J. CLEMENTS

Attorney at KLEHR HARRISON HARVEY BRANZBURG LLP

1835 Market St Ste 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19103

WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG

Attorney at Zimolong LLC

P.O. Box 552

Villanova, PA 19085-0552

Defendant Attorneys

ELLEN O'KEEFE CORRIGAN

Attorney at CITY OF PHILADELPHIA

1515 Arch St 15Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JOSEPH T. CLEARY

Attorney at CLEARY JOSEM & TRIGIANI LLP

325 Chestnut St Suite 200

Philadelphia, PA 19106

CASSIE RACHEL EHRENBERG

Attorney at CLEARY JOSEM & TRIGIANI LLP

325 Chestnut St Suite 200

Philadelphia, PA 19106

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG on behalf of Dobson Mills Apartments, L.P., Dobson Scotts, L.P., Mansion at Bala, L.P. (ZIMOLONG, WALTER) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses by Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(CLEARY, JOSEPH) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, filed by Dobson Mills Apartments, L.P., Mansion at Bala, L.P., Dobson Scotts, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH T. CLEARY on behalf of Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO with Certificate of Service(CLEARY, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by CASSIE RACHEL EHRENBERG on behalf of Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO with Certificate of Service(EHRENBERG, CASSIE) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ELLEN O'KEEFE CORRIGAN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (CORRIGAN, ELLEN) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14856941.), filed by Dobson Mills Apartments, L.P., Mansion at Bala, L.P., Dobson Scotts, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/21/2021) (tjd, ). (Entered: 01/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG on behalf of Dobson Mills Apartments, L.P., Dobson Scotts, L.P., Mansion at Bala, L.P. (ZIMOLONG, WALTER) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, With Affirmative Defenses by Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO.(CLEARY, JOSEPH) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO, filed by Dobson Mills Apartments, L.P., Mansion at Bala, L.P., Dobson Scotts, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH T. CLEARY on behalf of Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO with Certificate of Service(CLEARY, JOSEPH) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by CASSIE RACHEL EHRENBERG on behalf of Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO with Certificate of Service(EHRENBERG, CASSIE) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ELLEN O'KEEFE CORRIGAN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA (CORRIGAN, ELLEN) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/21/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, Pennsylvania Building and Construction Trades Council, AFL-CIO ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14856941.), filed by Dobson Mills Apartments, L.P., Mansion at Bala, L.P., Dobson Scotts, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(CLEMENTS, WILLIAM) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/21/2021) (tjd, ). (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J. CLEMENTS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALTER STEPHEN ZIMOLONG