Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2019 at 07:01:11 (UTC).

Dobashi et al v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 Dobashi filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph C. Spero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05558

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph C. Spero

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maher Nagi Musaid

Ebrahim Musleh Mohamed

Fawwaz Ismail

Yara Al Amri

Abdo Ali Mohamed

Ameen Alshohatee

Hajer Taleb

Hanna Dobashi

Mused Ali Riyashi

Tufaic Mohamed Nagi

Rashad Hizam Alamari

Nassem Omer

Fahmi Abdo Khaled Hassan

Defendants

Michael Pompeo

Donald Trump

Secretary USDHS Kevin McAleenan

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Department of State

United States of America

Kevin McAleenan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marc VanDerHout

Attorney at Van Der Hout, Brigagliano Nightingale, LLP

180 Sutter Street, Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

David Wolfe Rivkin

Attorney at Debevoise and Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Kelsey Ann Morales

Attorney at Van Der Hout, LLP

180 Sutter Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

Diala Shamas

666 Broadway, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10012

Elizabeth Marie Costello

Attorney at Debevoise and Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Quenique Newbill

Attorney at Debevoise and Plimpton LLP

919 Third Ave, Floor 47S36

New York, NY 10022

Baher Azmy

Attorney at Center for Constitutional Rights

666 Broadway, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10012

Marc Van Der Hout

Attorney at Van Der Hout, LLP

180 Sutter Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94104

Christopher Sean Ford

Attorney at Debevoise and Plimpton LLP

919 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Sharanya Mohan

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

450 Golden Gate Avenue, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Kenneth John Ian

Attorney at US Dept of Justice

Po Box 868

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

(#22) Order, signed 10/21/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Quenique Newbill.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#20

RESTRICTED

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

(#17) ORDER, signed 9/20/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David W. Rivkin. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#14

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Order, signed 9/18/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Diala Shamas.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rashad Hizam Alamari, Ameen Alshohatee, Yara Al Amri, Hanna Dobashi, Fahmi Abdo Khaled Hassan, Fawwaz Ismail, Abdo Ali Mohamed, Ebrahim Musleh Mohamed, Maher Nagi Musaid, Tufaic Mohamed Nagi, Nassem Omer, Mused Ali Riyashi, Hajer Taleb re #14 Summons Issued, #4 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Complaint,,,, /Affidavit of 9/20/19 Service via certified mail, return receipt requested on all federal defendants and the US Attorney General. (Costello, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/14/2019) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth John Ian (Ian, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/31/2019) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Order, signed 10/21/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Quenique Newbill.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13791677.) filed by Rashad Hizam Alamari, Ameen Alshohatee, Yara Al Amri, Hanna Dobashi, Fahmi Abdo Khaled Hassan, Fawwaz Ismail, Abdo Ali Mohamed, Ebrahim Musleh Mohamed, Maher Nagi Musaid, Tufaic Mohamed Nagi, Nassem Omer, Mused Ali Riyashi, Hajer Taleb. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Newbill, Quenique) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rashad Hizam Alamari, Ameen Alshohatee, Yara Al Amri, Hanna Dobashi, Fahmi Abdo Khaled Hassan, Fawwaz Ismail, Abdo Ali Mohamed, Ebrahim Musleh Mohamed, Maher Nagi Musaid, Tufaic Mohamed Nagi, Nassem Omer, Mused Ali Riyashi, Hajer Taleb re #14 Summons Issued, #4 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #1 Complaint,,,, /Affidavit of 9/20/19 Service via certified mail, return receipt requested on all federal defendants and the US Attorney General. (Costello, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/14/2019) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kevin McAleenan, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, United States of America.. (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Sharanya Mohan (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 9/27/2019) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER, signed 9/20/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David W. Rivkin. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER, signed 9/20/19, by Chief Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Christopher S. Ford. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Order, signed 9/20/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Elizabeth Costello.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2019) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Summons Issued as to Kevin McAleenan, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, United States of America. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rashad Hizam Alamari, Ameen Alshohatee, Yara Al Amri, Hanna Dobashi, Fahmi Abdo Khaled Hassan, Fawwaz Ismail, Abdo Ali Mohamed, Ebrahim Musleh Mohamed, Maher Nagi Musaid, Tufaic Mohamed Nagi, Nassem Omer, Mused Ali Riyashi, Hajer Taleb.. (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 9/18/2019) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Proposed Summons. (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 9/18/2019) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Nassem Omer, Ebrahim Musleh Mohamed, Hajer Taleb, Hanna Dobashi, Fawwaz Ismail, Fahmi Abdo Khaled Hassan, Rashad Hizam Alamari, Maher Nagi Musaid, Mused Ali Riyashi, Abdo Ali Mohamed, Yara Al Amri, Tufaic Mohamed Nagi, Ameen Alshohatee as to All Defendants. (Van Der Hout, Marc) (Filed on 9/18/2019) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order, signed 9/18/19, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Diala Shamas.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2019) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Diala Shamas ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13708043.) filed by Rashad Hizam Alamari, Ameen Alshohatee, Yara Al Amri, Hanna Dobashi, Fahmi Abdo Khaled Hassan, Fawwaz Ismail, Abdo Ali Mohamed, Ebrahim Musleh Mohamed, Maher Nagi Musaid, Tufaic Mohamed Nagi, Nassem Omer, Mused Ali Riyashi, Hajer Taleb. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Shamas, Diala) (Filed on 9/16/2019) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Kevin McAleenan, Michael Pompeo, Donald Trump, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of State, United States of America. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/19/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 9/4/2019) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and for a Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-13675948.). Filed by Nassem Omer, Ebrahim Musleh Mohamed, Hajer Taleb, Hanna Dobashi, Fawwaz Ismail, Fahmi Abdo Khaled Hassan, Rashad Hizam Alamari, Maher Nagi Musaid, Mused Ali Riyashi, Abdo Ali Mohamed, Yara Al Amri, Tufaic Mohamed Nagi, Ameen Alshohatee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28) (VanDerHout, Marc) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/10/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David W. Rivkin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baher Azmy