This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2022 at 11:24:44 (UTC).

DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Rojas-Escobar

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Rojas-Escobar. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01409

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raul M. Arias-Marxuach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC.

Defendant

Jessica Rojas-Escobar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano

Attorney at Sergio A. Ramirez de Arrellano Law Office

Banco Popular Center Suite 1022, 209 Munoz Rivera Ave.

San Juan, PR 00918-1009

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Jessica Rojas Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

3 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. upon Jessica Rojas-Escobar served on 9/6/2022, answer due 9/27/2022. (Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. upon Jessica Rojas-Escobar served on 9/6/2022, answer due 9/27/2022. (Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Jessica Rojas Escobar. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach. (vdm) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against JESSICA ROJAS ESCOBAR ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-7896478.), filed by DLJ MORTGAGE CAPITAL, INC.. Service due by 11/28/2022, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Note, #4 Summons Summons)(Ramirez-De-Arellano, Sergio) (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. by Caliber Home Loans Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano