This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2020 at 11:32:14 (UTC).

D'Jay v. Nugent

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 D'Jay filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Nugent. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01826

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETER D'JAY

Defendant

DALE NUGENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell Ray Hatten

Attorney at Chalat Hatten & Banker, P.C.

1600 Broadway, Suite 1920

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Alan Scott

Attorney at White & Steele PC

600 17Th Street, Dominion Towers, Suite 600N

Denver, CO 80202-5406

Nicholas Bowles Klann

Attorney at White & Steele PC

600 17Th Street, Dominion Towers, Suite 600N

Denver, CO 80202-5406

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 August 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#15

(#15) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 8/6/2020. Discovery Deadline: February 26, 2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline: March 12, 2021. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: December 31, 2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: February 15, 2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#14

(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order Amended by Plaintiff Peter D'Jay. (Hatten, Russell) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#13

(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Peter D'Jay All parties do not consent.. (Hatten, Russell) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#12

(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Peter D'Jay. (Hatten, Russell) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Bowles Klann on behalf of Dale NugentAttorney Nicholas Bowles Klann added to party Dale Nugent(pty:dft) (Klann, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Russell Ray Hatten on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Russell Ray Hatten added to party Peter D'Jay(pty:pla) (Hatten, Russell) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 24 June 2020. Pursuant to the Order of Reference 7 , this Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on August 6, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The Defendant shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Status Conference. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the parties and any unrepresented non-prisonerparties in this case are to hold a meeting in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before July 16, 2020 and jointly prepare a proposed Scheduling Order. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#5

(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Dale Nugent on 06/02/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against PETER D'JAY, filed by DALE NUGENT.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DALE NUGENT from Boulder, Case Number 20cv30398. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7351659), filed by DALE NUGENT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Scott, Andrew) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 August 2020. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 8/6/2020. Discovery Deadline: February 26, 2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline: March 12, 2021. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: December 31, 2020. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: February 15, 2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order Amended by Plaintiff Peter D'Jay. (Hatten, Russell) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Peter D'Jay All parties do not consent.. (Hatten, Russell) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Peter D'Jay. (Hatten, Russell) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Bowles Klann on behalf of Dale NugentAttorney Nicholas Bowles Klann added to party Dale Nugent(pty:dft) (Klann, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER Due to continued concerns regarding the potential transmission of COVID-19, during the week of August 3, 2020, the Court will permit litigants (counsel and parties) and the public to appear at all scheduled conferences before Magistrate Judge Hegarty either in person or by telephone (unless otherwise ordered). Anyone choosing to appear in person must comply with General Order 2020-10 governing Court Operations During the COVID-19 Pandemic, which may be accessed at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Anyone choosing to appear by telephone shall call the following conference line at the appointed time: Number:888-278-0296 Access code:8212991#. Please remember that, when you call in, you may be entering a proceeding already in progress for a different case; therefore, as you would if you were present in the courtroom, please ensure silence until your case is called. Any questions regarding this procedure may be directed to my chambers at 303-844-4507 or at hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/27/2020. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Russell Ray Hatten on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Russell Ray Hatten added to party Peter D'Jay(pty:pla) (Hatten, Russell) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 24 June 2020. Pursuant to the Order of Reference 7 , this Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on August 6, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The Defendant shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Status Conference. It is further ORDERED that counsel for the parties and any unrepresented non-prisonerparties in this case are to hold a meeting in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before July 16, 2020 and jointly prepare a proposed Scheduling Order. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/23/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#6) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Dale Nugent on 06/02/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against PETER D'JAY, filed by DALE NUGENT.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DALE NUGENT from Boulder, Case Number 20cv30398. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7351659), filed by DALE NUGENT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Scott, Andrew) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less