This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2020 at 14:32:28 (UTC).

Dixon v. Thorpe

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 Dixon filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Thorpe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Kleeh and Michael John Aloi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cameron Dixon

Glenville, WV 26351

Defendant

James Thorpe

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#9

(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 5/13/20. (mh) (To PS Plaintiff via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

7 #3

Certified Mail Return Receipt

7 #2

Consent to Collection

7 #1

PTAR

#7

(#7) ORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/10/2020. (To PS Plaintiff by cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2020: #1 PTAR, #2 Consent to Collection) (dk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2020: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#4

(#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice and #3 Letter. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/23/20. (mh) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

3 #2

Certified Mail Return Receipt

3 #1

First page of form

#3

(#3) LETTER from Clerk of Court to Cameron Dixon re: filing fees. (Attachments: #1 First page of form)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

2 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#2

(#2) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against James Thorpe, filed by Cameron Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Envelope)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #3 Exhibit B - Credit Reports (Sealed per Chambers)) (mh). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 5/13/20. (mh) (To PS Plaintiff via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN RECEIPT as to #7 Order. SERVICE ACCEPTED on (Per USPS 4/15/20). (mh) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 4/10/2020. (To PS Plaintiff by cert. mail) (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2020: #1 PTAR, #2 Consent to Collection) (dk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2020: #3 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cameron Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN RECEIPT as to #2 Notice and #3 Letter. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 3/23/20. (mh) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER from Clerk of Court to Cameron Dixon re: filing fees. (Attachments: #1 First page of form)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #2 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against James Thorpe, filed by Cameron Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Receipts, #2 Envelope)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2020: #3 Exhibit B - Credit Reports (Sealed per Chambers)) (mh). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less