This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 08:15:51 (UTC).

Dixon v. GardaWorld CashLINK, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Dixon filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against GardaWorld CashLINK, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Justin S. Anand and Clarence Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02022

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Justin S. Anand

Presiding Judge

Clarence Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harvetta Dixon

Defendant

GardaWorld CashLINK, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Stephen Mixon

Attorney at Millar & Mixon, LLC -GA

Suite 150, 1691 Phoenix Boulevard

Atlanta, GA 30349

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvetta Dixon. GardaWorld CashLINK, LLC waiver mailed on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Mixon, J.) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

#4

(#4) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to GardaWorld CashLINK, LLC. (bdb) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#2

(#2) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - Write-up

1 #3

Exhibit C- Complaint of Sexual Harassment and retaliation

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Right to Sue

1 #1

Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Harvetta Dixon. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9687065) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C- Complaint of Sexual Harassment and retaliation, #4 Exhibit D - Write-up, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harvetta Dixon. GardaWorld CashLINK, LLC waiver mailed on 5/14/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Mixon, J.) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to GardaWorld CashLINK, LLC. (bdb) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/30/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Harvetta Dixon. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9687065) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit C- Complaint of Sexual Harassment and retaliation, #4 Exhibit D - Write-up, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDAWORLD CASHLINK LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Stephen Mixon