This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2021 at 10:48:41 (UTC).

Dixon v. Baker-Hill Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 Dixon filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Baker-Hill Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Federico A. Moreno. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-60535

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Federico A. Moreno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Dixon

Defendants

Matthew Ricci

Baker-Hill Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chris Kleppin

Attorney at The Kleppin Firm, P.A.

8751 W. Broward Blvd, Suite 105

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Steven Adam Siegel

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips

450 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL and ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval, In Camera Review of Settlement Agreement and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci. Responses due by 5/11/2021 (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#7

(#7) Statement of: Claim by James Dixon (Kleppin, Chris) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by James Dixon. Matthew Ricci served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Kleppin, Chris) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by James Dixon. Baker-Hill Industries, Inc. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Kleppin, Chris) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN FLSA CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (jz01) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci. (jao) . (Entered: 03/09/2021)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14506026, filed by James Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Kleppin, Chris) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated as per DE #12 . (lk) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL and ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval, In Camera Review of Settlement Agreement and Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci. Responses due by 5/11/2021 (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci (Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendants may file a response to the complaint by April 14, 2021. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/5/2021. (mmd) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci. Attorney Steven Adam Siegel added to party Baker-Hill Industries, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Steven Adam Siegel added to party Matthew Ricci(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of: Claim by James Dixon (Kleppin, Chris) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by James Dixon. Matthew Ricci served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Kleppin, Chris) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by James Dixon. Baker-Hill Industries, Inc. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (Kleppin, Chris) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN FLSA CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (jz01) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci. (jao) . (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Baker-Hill Industries, Inc., Matthew Ricci. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14506026, filed by James Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Kleppin, Chris) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chris Kleppin