This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 07:31:14 (UTC).

Dixon v. Baird et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 Dixon filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against Baird. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and P. Bradley Murray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00089

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

P. Bradley Murray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Dixon

Mobile, AL 36606

Defendants

Mobile Housing

Legal Service

C. Jame Baird

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Order directing Plaintiff to refile the Complaint by 5/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/3/2019. Copy of Order & Pro Se Litigant Guide mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Dixon - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tgw) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against C. Jame Baird, Legal Service, Mobile Housing filed by Charles Dixon. (tgw) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order directing Plaintiff to refile the Complaint by 5/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/3/2019. Copy of Order & Pro Se Litigant Guide mailed to Plaintiff. (tgw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles Dixon - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tgw) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against C. Jame Baird, Legal Service, Mobile Housing filed by Charles Dixon. (tgw) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less