This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2020 at 13:30:41 (UTC).

Dixon #200732 v. Brown

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 Dixon 200732 filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet T. Neff and Maarten Vermaat. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Janet T. Neff

Referral Judge

Maarten Vermaat

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anthony Dixon #200732

Kincheloe, MI 49786

Respondent

Mike Brown

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER denying #11 and #13 construed as a motion to alter or amend judgment; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

13 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion #11 by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (slk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732 re MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion #11 (slk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

11 #2

Exhibit 1

11 #1

Affidavit in Support

#11

(#11) MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit 1) (slk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#10

(#10) JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying certificate of appealability; Petitioner's request for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED as moot; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#7

Copy of Deficiency Order, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (mlc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#6

Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (mlc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11412; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#4

TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Anthony Dixon 200732KINROSS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY4533 W. Industrial Park DriveKINCHELOE, MI 49786 (TMcg) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION [MOTION] to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Anthony Dixon. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#11) MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit 1) (slk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct #14 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (slk) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER denying #11 and #13 construed as a motion to alter or amend judgment; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion #11 by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (slk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732 re MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion #11 (slk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to amend/correct #1 regarding exhaustion by petitioner Anthony Dixon #200732; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit 1) (slk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $5.00, receipt number MQ006131; amount paid to date $5.00 (slk) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #9 , Opinion (Screening) #8 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (mlc) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying certificate of appealability; Petitioner's request for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED as moot; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) OPINION; Order and Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Deficiency Order, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (mlc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/10/2020 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Dixon (mlc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11412; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Anthony Dixon 200732KINROSS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY4533 W. Industrial Park DriveKINCHELOE, MI 49786 (TMcg) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Gershwin A. Drain. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION [MOTION] to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Anthony Dixon. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Dixon against Mike Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less