Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2021 at 22:59:52 (UTC).

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA v. EXXON MOBIL CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against EXXON MOBIL CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01932

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Defendants

EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION

EXXON MOBIL CORP.

SHELL OIL COMPANY

CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC

BP P.L.C.

BP AMERICA INC.

CHEVRON CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Hassan A. Zavareei

Attorney at TYCKO & ZAVAREEI, LLP

1828 L Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Kathleen M. Konopka

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR D.C.

400 6Th Street, Nw, Ste 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Anna C. Haac

Attorney at TYCKO & ZAVAREEI, LLP

1828 L Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Katherine M Aizpuru

Attorney at TYCKO & ZAVAREEI LLP

1828 L St., Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Victor Marc Sher

Attorney at SHER EDLING LLP

100 Montgomery Street, Ste 1410

San Francisco, CA 94104

Matthew T. Heartney

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

777 S. Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Justin A. Anderson

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Theodore V. Wells, Jr.

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Patrick J. Conlon

Attorney at EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

22777 Springwoods Village Parkway, 22777 Springwoods Village Parkway, Room N1.4B.388

Spring, TX 77389

Daniel John Toal

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Brendan J. Crimmins

Attorney at KELLOGG, HANSEN, TODD, FIGEL & FREDERICK, PLLC

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

David Charles Frederick

Attorney at KELLOGG, HANSEN, TODD, FIGEL & FREDERICK, P.L.L.C.

1615 M Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Thomas G. Hungar

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, Nw, 9Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Joshua S. Lipshutz

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, Nw, 9Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jonathan W. Hughes

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, Ste 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nancy G. Milburn

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Diana E. Reiter

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

Ethan G. Shenkman

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

601 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

John D. Lombardo

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER KAYE SCHOLER LLP

777 South Figueroa Street, 44Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

19 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

71 #1

Exhibit A

#71

(#71) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edling, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#70

(#70) RESPONSE re #67 MOTION to Strike #66 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#69

(#69) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Anthony Thompson on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Thompson, Craig) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#67

(#67) MOTION to Strike #66 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Edling, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

66 #1

Exhibit A

#66

(#66) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#65

(#65) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kathryn Sammons on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Sammons, Mary) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Simplicio on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Simplicio, Kristen) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

1 #15

Exhibit 14

1 #14

Exhibit 13

1 #13

Exhibit 12

1 #12

Exhibit 11

1 #11

Exhibit 10

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

169 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edling, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) RESPONSE re #67 MOTION to Strike #66 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Anthony Thompson on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Thompson, Craig) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) RESPONSE re #66 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (See Docket Entry #67 to view document) (ztth) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) MOTION to Strike #66 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Edling, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kathryn Sammons on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Sammons, Mary) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Simplicio on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Simplicio, Kristen) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) REPLY to opposition to motion re #45 MOTION to Remand filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Sher, Victor) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny W Carter on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Carter, Johnny) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lipshutz on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Hungar on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Hungar, Thomas) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Boutrous, Theodore) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of CHEVRON CORPORATION, CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick J. Conlon on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Conlon, Patrick) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Wells, Theodore) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel J. Toal, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7353862. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel J. Toal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Theodore) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin A. Anderson on behalf of EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION (Anderson, Justin) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EXXON MOBIL CORP., EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1815. (Wells, Theodore) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia Civil Division, case number 2020 CA 002892 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADCDC-7353661 filed by EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION, EXXON MOBIL CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14)(Wells, Theodore) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ExxonMobil Oil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Exxon Mobil Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Shell Oil Company is a litigant