This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2021 at 08:52:40 (UTC).

District Attorney of Clearfield County v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 District Attorney of Clearfield County filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45022

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

District Attorney Of Clearfield County

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Richard S. Sackler

Rite Aid Corporation

Mallinckrodt LLC

Ahold U.S.A., Inc.

Beverly Sackler

Mallinckrodt PLC

Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.

Rite Aid of Pennsylvania, Inc.

Wal-Mart Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

The Giant Company LLC

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Value Drug Company

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gabriel C. Magee

Attorney at Pogust Millrood

Eight Tower Bridge, 161 Washington Street

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Defendant Attorneys

John Chase Johnson

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP

850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Weiss K Nusraty

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP

850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Kevin B. Collins

Attorney at Covington & Burling

One Citycenter, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

John W Zipp

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING, LLP

850 Tenth Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Susan Reagan Gittes

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jacob W Stahl

Attorney at DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gregory P. Joseph

Attorney at Joseph Hage Aaronson

30Th Floor, 485 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Marisel Acosta

Attorney at MORGAN LEWIS & BOCKIUS

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James T. Kitchen

Attorney at Jones Day

500 Grant Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Thomas J. Elliott

Attorney at Elliott, Mannino & Flaherty

1800 One Meridian Plaza

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Other Attorneys

Andreas Ringstad

Attorney at CAMPBELL CONROY & O'NEIL, P.C.

1205 Westlakes Drive, Suite 330

Berwyn, PA 19312

Frank Lane Heard, III

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 Twelfth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Katy E. Koski

Attorney at Foley & Lardner - Boston

111 Huntington Avenue

Boston, MA 02199

James W. Matthews

Attorney at Foley & Lardner - Boston

111 Huntington Avenue

Boston, MA 02199

Ryan Zane Watts

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer - Washington

601 Massachusetts Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Douglas E. Roberts

Attorney at PIETRAGALLO GORDON ALFANO BOSICK & RASPANTI

1818 Market St Suite 3402

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Daniel G. Jarcho

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Washington

950 F Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Mark D. Villanueva

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Cari K. Dawson

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Atlanta

One Atlantic Center, 1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

39 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#6

#9

#11

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case number 2:20-cv-05171. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER THAT THE ACTIONS LISTED ON SCHEDULE A ARE TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, AND WITH THE CONSENT OF THAT COURT, ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAN A. POSER FOR INCLUSION IN THE COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS; ETC. (JL ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY MEMORANDUM BY CVS PHARMACY INC. SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING LIKELY TRANSFER TO MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, EXHIBITS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION IS GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED THAT REPLY BRIEF ATTACHED TO THE MOTION AS EXHIBIT A SHALL BE DEEMED FILED AND DOCKETED BY THE CLERK OF COURT AS OF THE DATE OF ENTRY OF THIS ORDE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/18/20. 12/21/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File a reply Brief in further support of Defendants Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by CVS HEALTH CORPORATION.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Brief, #3 Exhibit 2 to Reply Brief)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF CLEARFIELD COUNTY. (MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TIME FOR CVS PHARMACY INC TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO REMAND IS EXTENDED TO 12/7/20. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/20/20. 11/20/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand filed by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF CLEARFIELD COUNTY.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by GABRIEL C. MAGEE on behalf of DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF CLEARFIELD COUNTY with Certificate of Service(MAGEE, GABRIEL) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including CVS Health Corporation by CVS PHARMACY, INC..(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by CVS PHARMACY, INC. of State Court Order Staying Defendants Response Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Order)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS PHARMACY, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14644847), filed by CVS PHARMACY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (transfer order), #2 Exhibit 2 (pleadings), #3 Exhibit 3 (consent), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(VILLANUEVA, MARK) [Transferred from paed on 2/17/2021.] (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Giant Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ahold U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Value Drug Company is a litigant