This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/06/2021 at 07:31:55 (UTC).

Display Vectors LLC v. Sound Around Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 Display Vectors LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Sound Around Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela K. Chen and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03230

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Display Vectors LLC

Defendant

Sound Around Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Loaknauth

Attorney at Law Office of Nicholas Loaknauth, P.C.

1460 Broadway

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Display Vectors LLC. Sound Around Inc. served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

5 #1

complaint

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Sound Around Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit 2: Claim Chart

1 #3

Exhibit 1: US Pat. No. 6,785,128

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sound Around Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14544568 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Display Vectors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1: US Pat. No. 6,785,128, #4 Exhibit 2: Claim Chart) (Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Display Vectors LLC. Sound Around Inc. served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED INTO PATENT PILOT PROGRAM. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom no longer assigned to case (Mahoney, Brenna) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketPATENT PILOT REASSIGNMENT ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case from the patent pilot wheel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/9/2021. (Wilhelm, Samantha) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Sound Around Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketThis is a patent case and is eligible for the Patent Pilot Project. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sound Around Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14544568 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Display Vectors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1: US Pat. No. 6,785,128, #4 Exhibit 2: Claim Chart) (Loaknauth, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sound Around Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Display Vectors LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Netram Loaknauth