This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:20:59 (UTC).

Display Technologies, LLC v. Mocacare Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Display Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Mocacare Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley, Edward J. Davila and Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00219

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan van Keulen

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Edward J. Davila

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Display Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Mocacare Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Display Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Display Technologies, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Mocacare Corp. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

copy of Complaint

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by February 14, 2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Display Technologies, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#13) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before the Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2022. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2022) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 2/11/22. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2022) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Display Technologies, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 2/9/2022) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by February 14, 2022. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 copy of Complaint)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Mocacare Corp. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2022 01:30 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Display Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Display Technologies, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Mocacare Corp. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16800358.). Filed byDisplay Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2022) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Display Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin