This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2021 at 10:44:56 (UTC).

Display Technologies, LLC v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Case Summary

On July 27, 2021, Display Technologies, LLC (“Plaintiff” or “Display”), represented by D. Bradley Kizzia and Jay B. Johnson of Kizzia & Johnson PLLC, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (“Defendant” or “Mercedes”), seeking injunctive reliefs and damages along with prejudgement and post judgement reliefs among other reliefs for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged infringement of the United States Patent No. 9,300,723 (the “‘723 Patent”) (“Patent-in-suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe one or more claims, including at least Claim 12 of the ‘723 Patent by making, using, and/or selling media systems covered by one or more claims of the ‘723 Patent” and “Defendant makes, uses, and/or sells the Mercedes-Benz car infotainment system, and any similar products (“Product”). Defendant has infringed and continues to infringe the ‘723 Patent in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendant’s actions complained of herein will continue unless Defendant is enjoined by this court” and “Defendant’s actions complained of herein are causing irreparable harm and monetary damage to Plaintiff and will continue to do so unless and until Defendant is enjoined and restrained by this Court.”

 

Plaintiff even further alleged that, “When the wireless mobile device is within the wireless range, the wireless mobile device is detectable by the media system (e.g., the media system automatically detects a smartphone when the mobile device is within Bluetooth range). Certain aspects of this element are illustrated in the screenshots below and/or those provided in connection with other allegations herein.”

 

There is one claim of relief laid down by the Plaintiff, for the alleged infringement of the Patent-in-suit. 

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested the Court for an order enjoining Defendant, its agents, officers, servants, employees, attorneys, and all persons in active concert or participation with Defendant who receive notice of the order from further infringement of United States Patent No. 9,300,723 and an award for damages resulting from Defendant’s infringement in accordance with 35 U.S.C. § 284 along with prejudgement and post-judgement interests and costs and any other relief the Court deems just. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00766

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Display Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

D. Bradley Kizzia

Attorney at Kizzia & Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson PLLC

1910 Pacific Avenue, Suite 13000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Display Technologies, LLC as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Display Technologies, LLC. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#4

(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Display Technologies, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15054709), filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Display Technologies, LLC as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Display Technologies, LLC. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (lad) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Display Technologies, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15054709), filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Display Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D Bradley Kizzia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Brett Johnson