Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/23/2020 at 07:22:12 (UTC).

Display Technologies, LLC v. Ferrari North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2020 Display Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Ferrari North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00260

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Display Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Ferrari North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Defendant Attorney

Philip A. Rovner

Attorney at Potter Anderson & Corroon, LLP

1313 N. Market St., Hercules Plaza, 6Th Flr., P.O. Box 951

Wilmington, DE 19899-0951

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 18, 2020 - filed by Ferrari North America, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to April 16, 2020 - filed by Ferrari North America, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jay Johnson - filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 9,300,723. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ferrari North America, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2860582.) - filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 18, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Ferrari North America, Inc. answer due 5/18/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/6/2020. (nms) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to May 18, 2020 - filed by Ferrari North America, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to April 16, 2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Ferrari North America, Inc. answer due 4/16/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/11/2020. (crb) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to April 16, 2020 - filed by Ferrari North America, Inc.. (Rovner, Philip) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jay Johnson filed by Display Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/9/2020. (crb) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jay Johnson - filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00258-RGA, 1:20-cv-00259-RGA, 1:20-cv-00260-RGA, 1:20-cv-00261-RGA, 1:20-cv-00262-RGA (rjb) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ferrari North America, Inc. on 2/24/2020. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 9,300,723. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Ferrari North America, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2860582.) - filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mal) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Display Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ferrari North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip A. Rovner