This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:15:32 (UTC).

Display Technologies, LLC v. Etekcity Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Display Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Etekcity Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Display Technologies, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Etekcity Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Stephen M Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati PC

969 Hilgard Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

1717 Main Street Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Rodeen Talebi

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

633 West Fifth Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Etekcity Corporation, Defendant, designating Rodeen Talebi as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

21 #2

Proposed Order

21 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Texas

21 #21

Main Document

20 #1

ATTACHMENT

20 #20

Main Document

#22

(#22) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Etekcity Corporation, Defendant Etekcity Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32727930) #16 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 5-4.3.4, Application not hand-signed. (twdb) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Texas

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Corrected NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC, identifying Patent Asset Management LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC, identifying Patent Asset Management LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Etekcity Corporation, Defendant, designating Rodeen Talebi as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Etekcity Corporation, Defendant Etekcity Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 2/2/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32727930) filed by Defendant Etekcity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Texas, #2 Proposed Order) (Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 ATTACHMENT) (twdb) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Etekcity Corporation, Defendant Etekcity Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32727930) #16 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 5-4.3.4, Application not hand-signed. (twdb) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE by Judge Cormac J. Carney #17 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Etekcity Corporation, Defendant Etekcity Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32727930) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): The attorney seeking to appear pro hac vice must complete Section 1 of this Application, personally sign, in ink, the certification in Section II, and have the designated Local Counsel sign in Section III. ELECTRONIC SIGNATURES ARE NOT ACCEPTED. See Instructions for Applicants (1) (G-64). (lt) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC.(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) (STRICKEN PURSUANT TO #22) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Etekcity Corporation, Defendant Etekcity Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32727930) filed by Defendant Etekcity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Texas, #2 Proposed Order) (Talebi, Rodeen) Modified on 2/7/2022 (twdb). (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on April 7, 2022. (rrp) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Counter Claimant Etekcity Corporation, Defendant Etekcity Corporation identifying Vesync Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent. (Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Etekcity Corporation. (jtil) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corrected NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC, identifying Patent Asset Management LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC, identifying Patent Asset Management LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32615897 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party Display Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Display Technologies, LLC is a litigant