This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2022 at 11:26:29 (UTC).

Display Technologies, LLC v. Bionime USA Corporation

Case Summary

On 04/21/2022 Display Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Bionime USA Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00687

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Display Technologies, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Bionime USA Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Stephen M Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati PC

969 Hilgard Avenue Suite 1012

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Neil J. McNabnay

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

1717 Main Street, Suite 5000

Dallas, TX 75201

Rodeen Talebi

Attorney at Fish and Richardson PC

633 West Fifth Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC.(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #1

Exhibit Supreme Court of Texas Certificate of Good Standing

17 #17

Main Document

#18

(#18) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bionime USA Corporation, designating Rodeen Talebi as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Bionime USA Corporation, Defendant Bionime USA Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33321570) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ assignment, dated 4/22/22, Dkt. #6 . (lt) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit Supreme Court of Texas Certificate of Good Standing

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Counter Claimant Bionime USA Corporation, Defendant Bionime USA Corporation identifying Bionime Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Display Technologies, LLC filed by Defendant Bionime USA Corporation.(Attorney Rodeen Talebi added to party Bionime USA Corporation(pty:dft))(Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#11

(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Bionime USA Corporation served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susan, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Bionime USA Corporation. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41 Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC.(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Bionime USA Corporation, Defendant Bionime USA Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 5/18/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33321570) #14 ) filed by Defendant Bionime USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court of Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bionime USA Corporation, designating Rodeen Talebi as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Bionime USA Corporation, Defendant Bionime USA Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33321570) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ assignment, dated 4/22/22, Dkt. #6 . (lt) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District John W. Holcomb. Effective Monday, May 23, 2022, Judge John W. Holcomb will be located in the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor, located at 411 W. 4th Street, Santa Ana, California 92701-4516. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All required mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered and placed in the drop box located on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Judge Holcomb's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, may be reached at JWH_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Neil J. McNabnay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Counter Claimant Bionime USA Corporation, Defendant Bionime USA Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33321570) filed by Defendant Bionime USA Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court of Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Counter Claimant Bionime USA Corporation, Defendant Bionime USA Corporation identifying Bionime Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Display Technologies, LLC filed by Defendant Bionime USA Corporation.(Attorney Rodeen Talebi added to party Bionime USA Corporation(pty:dft))(Talebi, Rodeen) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC, upon Defendant Bionime USA Corporation served on 4/26/2022, answer due 5/17/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susan, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Bionime USA Corporation. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (sh) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC, identifying Patent Asset Management, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33171929 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party Display Technologies, LLC(pty:pla))(Lobbin, Stephen) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Display Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil J McNabnay

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rodeen Talebi