This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2022 at 07:53:21 (UTC).

Display Technologies, LLC v. A&D Medical Company, Limited

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Display Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against A D Medical Company, Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-09595

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Display Technologies, LLC

Defendant

A&D Medical Company, Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Michael Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Street, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92037

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey K. Riffer

Attorney at Elkins Kalt Weintraub Reuben Gartside LLP

10345 West Olympic Boulevardlos Angeles

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#4

(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Display Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Display Technologies, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to A&D Medical Company, Limited. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/11/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2021) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Display Technologies, LLC. A&D Medical Company, Limited served on 12/23/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/31/2021) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Display Technologies, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

12 #12

Main Document

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/10/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by A&D Medical Company, Limited. (Riffer, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by A&D Medical Company, Limited. (Riffer, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 3/22/2022 02:00 PM via Videoconference. Case Management Statement due by 3/15/2022. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/10/2022. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2022) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 1/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Display Technologies, LLC.. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 1/7/2022) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Display Technologies, LLC. A&D Medical Company, Limited served on 12/23/2021, answer due 1/13/2022. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/31/2021) (Entered: 12/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/11/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2021) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to A&D Medical Company, Limited. (kmg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2021. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Display Technologies, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management LLC for Display Technologies, LLC. re #1 Complaint, (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against A&D Medical Company, Limited ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16711876.). Filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lobbin, Stephen) (Filed on 12/13/2021) Modified on 12/14/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less