Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2020 at 08:55:48 (UTC).

Dismukes v. Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 Dismukes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerusha T. Adams and William Keith Watkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00130

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

Presiding Judge

William Keith Watkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashlee Smith Dismukes

Defendant

Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cynthia Forman Wilkinson

Attorney at Wilkinson Law Firm PC

1717 3Rd Avenue North, Suite A

Birmingham, AL 35203

Heather Newsom Leonard

Attorney at Heather Leonard, PC

2105 Devereux Circle, Suite 111

Birmingham, AL 35243

Defendant Attorneys

Ingu Hwang

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

445 Dexter Avenue; Suite 2040

Montgomery, AL 36104

Jennifer Manasco Busby

Attorney at Burr & Forman, LLP

420 N. 20Th Street, Ste 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

Elizabeth Bosquet Shirley

Attorney at Burr & Forman LLP

420 North 20Th Street; Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Busby, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#22

(#22) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/20/2020. (cnw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#21

(#21) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.. (Shirley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc..(Shirley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#19

(#19) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ashlee Smith Dismukes re #17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Leonard, Heather) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER: It is ORDERED that Def shall file a responsive pleading on or before 3/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/28/2020. (cnw, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

17 #1

Conflict Disclosure Statement

#17

(#17) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ashlee Smith Dismukes; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

16 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (green card signed, not dated) (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (Leonard, Heather) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc..(Shirley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Busby, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket(#23) TEXT ORDER: The parties' Rule 26(f) Report was due on 4/13/2020. To date, no report has been filed. It is ORDERED that the parties must file their Rule 26(f) report on or before 4/22/2020. If the parties have not yet conferred, they may do so telephonically or via video conference. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 4/15/2020. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/20/2020. (cnw, ) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc.. (Shirley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hyundai Power Transformers, USA, Inc..(Shirley, Elizabeth) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ashlee Smith Dismukes re #17 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Leonard, Heather) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: It is ORDERED that Def shall file a responsive pleading on or before 3/13/2020. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 2/28/2020. (cnw, ) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Ashlee Smith Dismukes; Corporate Disclosures due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Disclosure Statement)(cnw, ) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01916. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER OF TRANSFER - Accordingly, Defendant's motion (Doc. #12 ) is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 2/24/2020. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc. filed by Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc (Busby, Jennifer) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleading Motion is RIPE 1/3/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc. (Busby, Jennifer) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia F Wilkinson on behalf of Ashlee Smith Dismukes (Wilkinson, Cynthia) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (green card signed, not dated) (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, ) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (Leonard, Heather) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3485384. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc, filed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(KEK). (Leonard, Heather) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hyundai Power Transformers USA Inc, filed by Ashlee Smith Dismukes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 2/26/2020.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cynthia Wilkinson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather Newsom Leonard