This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2021 at 01:11:52 (UTC).

Dish Network LLC. v. Jadoo TV, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Dish Network LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Jadoo TV, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01891

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Laurel Beeler

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dish Network L.L.C.

Defendants

Jadoo TV, Inc.

Haseeb Shah

Sajid Sohail

Punit Bhatt

EAST WEST AUDIO VIDEO, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy M Frank

Attorney at Hagan Noll and Boyle LLC

820 Gessner Road Suite 940

Houston, TX 77024

David A Van Riper

Attorney at Van Riper Law

1254 Irvine Boulevard Suite 200

Tustin, CA 92780-3571

Joseph H Boyle

Attorney at Hagan Noll and Boyle LLC

820 Gessner Suite 940

Houston, TX 77024

Stephen Matthew Ferguson

Attorney at Hagan Noll & Boyle LLC

Two Memorial City Plaza, 820 Gessner, Suite 940

Houston, TX 77024

David Michael Korn

Attorney at Hagan Noll Boyle, LLC

820 Gessner, Suite 940

Houston, TX 77024

Defendant Attorneys

Ashish Sudhakaran

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Nicole Nacpil Daryanani

Attorney at Chan Punzalan LLP

2000 Alameda De Las Pulgas, Suite 154

San Mateo, CA 94403

Heidi J Kim

Attorney at Chan Punzalan LLP

2000 Alameda De Las Pulgas Suite 154

San Mateo, CA 94403

Mark Punzalan

Attorney at Chan Punzalan LLP

2000 Alameda De Las Pulgas, Suite 154

San Mateo, CA 94403

Alexander B Parker

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers - San Francisco

Two Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Darin W Snyder

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

Two Embarcadero Center 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Bill Trac

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 28Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-3823

Shinhong Byun

Attorney at Chan Punzalan LLP

2000 Alameda De Las Pulgas, Suite 154

San Mateo, CA 94403

Heidi J. Kim

Attorney at Chan Punzalan LLP

22 Battery Street, Suite 401

San Francisco, CA 94111

Benjamin Mathes Haber

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

John Dimuzio, Jr

Attorney at Berstein Law PC

4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 600 East Tower

Newport Beach, CA 92660

David A Berstein

Attorney at Berstein Law PC

4000 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

#211

(#211) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/31/2021. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#210

(#210) ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySajid Sohail. (Daryanani, Nicole) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

208 #1

Exhibits 1-10

#208

(#208) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Ferguson, Stephen) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#207

(#207) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #201 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

201 #1

Proposed Order

#201

(#207) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #201 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Matthew Ferguson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H Boyle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Punit Bhatt, East West Audio Video, Inc., Jadoo TV, Inc., Haseeb Shah, Sajid Sohail. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dish Network L.L.C., (Frank, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Dish Network L.L.C.. (Frank, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#2

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Dish Network L.L.C.. (Frank, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 to Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Complaint

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Punit Bhatt, East West Audio Video, Inc., Jadoo TV, Inc., Haseeb Shah, Sajid Sohail. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

466 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#214) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The settlement conference previously scheduled for May 14, 2021 has been continued to June 17,2021. The parties shall comply with Judge DeMarchi's Standing Order re Settlement Conference Procedures at http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkdorders, which includes instructions and deadlines for the submission of Settlement Conference Statements and Confidential Settlement Letters in advance of the conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Settlement Conference set for 6/17/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#213) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Telephone Conference held on 5/10/2021. Pre-settlement telephone conference held on May 10, 2021. Counsel participating: Joseph Boyle, Stephen Feguson, Mark Punzalan, Shinhong Byun. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#212) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A Settlement Conference is hereby set for May 14, 2021 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. A Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference call with counsel only is set for May 10, 2021 10:30 AM. The parties shall comply with Judge DeMarchi's Standing Order re Settlement Conference Procedures at http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vkdorders, which includes instructions and deadlines for the submission of Settlement Conference Statements and Confidential Settlement Letters in advance of the conference.Video and Conference Call information will be emailed to counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. Telephone Conference set for 5/10/2021 10:30 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2021) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#211) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/31/2021. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2021) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #210 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Saj id Sohail (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#210) ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySajid Sohail. (Daryanani, Nicole) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#209) Order granting #208 Discovery Letter Brief entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler.The court orders the parties to confer by telephone within 10 days. If there are impediments to this timeline, the court will consider them if they are raised by Monday, October 5, 2020 at 4 p.m. Counsel must cc a courtesy copy of any request to extend the deadline to LBpo@cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#208) Discovery Letter Brief filed by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-10)(Ferguson, Stephen) (Filed on 10/2/2020) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#207) ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #201 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
201 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Dish Network L.L.C.. (Frank, Timothy) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stephen Matthew Ferguson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph H Boyle. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Punit Bhatt, East West Audio Video, Inc., Jadoo TV, Inc., Haseeb Shah, Sajid Sohail. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dish Network L.L.C., (Frank, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Dish Network L.L.C.. (Frank, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dish Network L.L.C.. (Frank, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22773273 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dish Network L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint) (Attorney Timothy M Frank added to party Dish Network L.L.C.(pty:pla))(Frank, Timothy) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dish Network LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Dimuzio, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander B Parker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bill Trac(Designation Retained)