This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2020 at 09:57:39 (UTC).

Dish Network L.L.C. et al v. Torres

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Dish Network L L C filed an Other - Communication lawsuit against Torres. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carlos E. Mendoza and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00878

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Communication

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nagrastar LLC

Dish Network L.L.C.

Defendant

Edgardo Torres

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James A. Boatman, Jr.

Attorney at The Boatman Law Firm, PA

Suite 202, 3021 Airport-Pulling Rd N

Naples, FL 34105

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) RETURN of service executed on 6/3/2020 by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC as to Edgardo Torres. (Boatman, James) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#6

(#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#5

(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested person order by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH DBS Corporation for Dish Network L.L.C.; Corporate Parent DISH Technologies L.L.C., Corporate Parent Kudelski Corporate, Inc. for Nagrastar LLC.. (Boatman, James) Modified on 5/26/2020 (SPM). (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Edgardo Torres. (SPM) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Edgardo Torres (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16837523) filed by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Boatman, James) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on 6/3/2020 by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC as to Edgardo Torres. (Boatman, James) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/22/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested person order by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC identifying Corporate Parent DISH Network Corporation, Corporate Parent DISH DBS Corporation for Dish Network L.L.C.; Corporate Parent DISH Technologies L.L.C., Corporate Parent Kudelski Corporate, Inc. for Nagrastar LLC.. (Boatman, James) Modified on 5/26/2020 (SPM). (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Edgardo Torres. (SPM) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-878-Orl-41LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Edgardo Torres (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16837523) filed by Dish Network L.L.C., Nagrastar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Boatman, James) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less