This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:12:52 (UTC).

DISH Network L.L.C. et al v. Lopes

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 DISH Network L L C filed an Other - Communication lawsuit against Lopes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise J. Casper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10327

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Communication

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise J. Casper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NagraStar LLC

DISH Network L.L.C.

Defendant

Peter Lopes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricia A. Szumowski

Attorney at Szumowski Law, P.C.

Suite 104, 417 West St.,, Po Box 2537

Amherst, MA 01004

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC identifying Other Affiliate DISH DBS Corporation, Other Affiliate DISH Orbital Corporation for DISH Network L.L.C.; Other Affiliate DISH Network Corporation, Other Affiliate EchoStar Corporation, Other Affiliate Nagra USA Inc. for NagraStar LLC.. (Szumowski, Patricia) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#7

(#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Peter Lopes, filed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC.(Szumowski, Patricia) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Peter Lopes Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7548835 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Szumowski, Patricia) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Peter Lopes served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Szumowski, Patricia) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

1 #2

Category Form

#4

(#4) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Peter Lopes, filed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC.(Szumowski, Patricia) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed Peter Lopes served on 2/28/2019, answer due 3/21/2019. (Szumowski, Patricia) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC identifying Other Affiliate DISH DBS Corporation, Other Affiliate DISH Orbital Corporation for DISH Network L.L.C.; Other Affiliate DISH Network Corporation, Other Affiliate EchoStar Corporation, Other Affiliate Nagra USA Inc. for NagraStar LLC.. (Szumowski, Patricia) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Peter Lopes Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7548835 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by DISH Network L.L.C., NagraStar LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Szumowski, Patricia) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.