This case was last updated from PACER on 08/06/2019 at 07:21:54 (UTC).

DiscoverOrg Data LLC v. Benchmark Corp et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 DiscoverOrg Data LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Benchmark Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald B. Leighton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05516

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald B. Leighton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DiscoverOrg Data LLC

Defendants

Benchmark VAR LLC

Benchmark Corp.

Benchmark Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaniel Eli Durrance

Attorney at NEWMAN & DU WORS LLP

2101 Fourth Avenue, Suite 1500

Seattle, WA 98121

John David Du Wors

Attorney at NEWMAN & DU WORS LLP

2101 Fourth Avenue, Suite 1500

Seattle, WA 98121

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Summons

1 #4

Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg Data LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC (Durrance, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (SP) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on BENCHMARK VAR, LLC c/o AGENTS AND CORPORATIONS, INC., REGISTERED AGENT on 6/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Durrance, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

1 #3

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5798352) Attorney Nathaniel Eli Durrance added to party DiscoverOrg Data LLC(pty:pla), filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Durrance, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Benchmark Corp and Benchmark VAR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/3/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on BENCHMARK VAR, LLC c/o AGENTS AND CORPORATIONS, INC., REGISTERED AGENT on 6/18/2019, filed by Plaintiff DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Durrance, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/26/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/3/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (SP) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Benchmark Corp and Benchmark VAR LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SP) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (SP) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for DiscoverOrg Data LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC (Durrance, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5798352) Attorney Nathaniel Eli Durrance added to party DiscoverOrg Data LLC(pty:pla), filed by DiscoverOrg Data LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Durrance, Nathaniel) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.