This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 08:22:08 (UTC).

Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC et al v. Ace Insurance Company of Midwest

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ace Insurance Company of Midwest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC

Diaster Management Recovery Group, LLC

Defendant

Ace Insurance Company of Midwest doing business as Chubb

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hans Kennon

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

20 N Orange Ave, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary David Sonenblum

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

110 Se 6Th Street., Suite 2600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Bradley S. Fischer

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

110 Se 6Th St. Ste 2600

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

Laura Farach Farrant

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

Suite 2600, 110 Se 6Th Street

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 6/8/2022 Discovery due by 4/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2023 Pretrial statement due by 8/15/2023 All other motions due by 8/22/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2023 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/17/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/31/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER denying #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/31/2022. (SJB) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#18

(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sonenblum, Zachary) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of compliance with Local Rule 3.01(G) re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC (Kennon, Hans) Text modified on 3/24/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/23/2022)

16 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #15 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Ace Insurance Company of Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sonenblum, Zachary) Modified on 3/23/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC. (Kennon, Hans) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC of Filing Affidavit in support of #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Kennon, Hans) Modified on 3/10/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Diaster Management Recovery Group, LLC. (Kennon, Hans) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

1 #11

Exhibit K - Estimates

1 #10

Exhibit J - 2021 Annual Reports

1 #8

Exhibit H - Summons Returned Served

1 #7

Exhibit G - Case Management Plan and Case Management

1 #6

Exhibit F - Designation of E-mail Addresses

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Court Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Docket

1 #1

Exhibit A - Federal Civil Cover Sheet

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • Docket(#21) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (SPM) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2022 Joinder of Parties due by 6/8/2022 Discovery due by 4/3/2023 Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2023 Pretrial statement due by 8/15/2023 All other motions due by 8/22/2023 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/1/2023 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/1/2023 Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2023 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/17/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/31/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER denying #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/31/2022. (SJB) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sonenblum, Zachary) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of compliance with Local Rule 3.01(G) re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC (Kennon, Hans) Text modified on 3/24/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in opposition re #15 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Ace Insurance Company of Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sonenblum, Zachary) Modified on 3/23/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC. (Kennon, Hans) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENDORSED ORDER striking without prejudice #12 Motion to Remand to State Court. Due to clerical error, only one page of Plaintiff's brief in support was attached to the instant Motion. Plaintiff may refile the Motion with the full brief attached on or before March 11, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/10/2022. (SJB) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE by Disaster Management Recovery Group, LLC of Filing Affidavit in support of #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Kennon, Hans) Modified on 3/10/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Diaster Management Recovery Group, LLC. (Kennon, Hans) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Ace Insurance Company of Midwest identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Ltd, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Ace Insurance Company of Midwest. (Sonenblum, Zachary) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace Insurance Company of Midwest.(Sonenblum, Zachary) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a Related Action pursuant to Local Rul 1.07(c) by Diaster Management Recovery Group, LLC. Related actions: yes. (Kennon, Hans) Modified on 3/4/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Diaster Management Recovery Group, LLC. (Kennon, Hans) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply. Defendant shall file responsively on or before March 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/1/2022. (SJB) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal /Complaint by Ace Insurance Company of Midwest. (Sonenblum, Zachary) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 2/25/2022. (PML) ctp (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/25/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-00412-PGB-EJK. (APV) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of Seminole County, case number 2022-CA-000030 filed in State Court on 1/6/2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19269520 filed by Ace Insurance Company of Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Summons, #6 Exhibit F - Designation of E-mail Addresses, #7 Exhibit G - Case Management Plan and Case Management Order, #8 Exhibit H - Summons Returned Served, #9 Exhibit I - Motion for Extension of Time, #10 Exhibit J - 2021 Annual Reports, #11 Exhibit K - Estimates)(Sonenblum, Zachary) Modified on 2/24/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISASTER MANAGEMENT RECOVERY GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley Steven Fischer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Farach Farrant