This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2023 at 09:53:42 (UTC).

Disarro v. EzriCare, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 Disarro filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against EzriCare, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Polster Chappell and Kyle C. Dudek. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00120

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheri Polster Chappell

Referral Judge

Kyle C. Dudek

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAM DISARRO

Defendants

EzriCare, LLC

EzriRx, LLC

Delsam Pharma LLC

Aru Pharma, Inc.

Amazon.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Newton Harris

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons Ezricare LLC

1 #3

Proposed Summons EZRIRX, LLC

1 #4

Proposed Summons Delsam Pharma

1 #5

Proposed Summons Aru Pharma

1 #6

Proposed Summons Amazon

#3

(#3) ORDERED: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by March 10, 2023. Failure to do so will cause the Court to close this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/24/2023. (AEH) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#4

(#4) ORDERED: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court's February 24, 2023, Order (Doc. #3) constitutes a final judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, deny any pending motions as moot, terminate all deadlines, and close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/14/2023. (AEH) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SEH) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JUDGMENT. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (SEH) (Entered: 03/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDERED: This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court's February 24, 2023, Order (Doc. #3) constitutes a final judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, deny any pending motions as moot, terminate all deadlines, and close the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/14/2023. (AEH) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDERED: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by March 10, 2023. Failure to do so will cause the Court to close this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/24/2023. (AEH) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:23-cv-0120-SPC-KCD. (SJB) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20541510) filed by Adam Disarro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Ezricare LLC, #3 Proposed Summons EzriRx, LLC, #4 Proposed Summons Delsam Pharma, #5 Proposed Summons Aru Pharma, #6 Proposed Summons Amazon)(Harris, Robert) Modified text on 2/24/2023. Summonses not issued, per #3 (SEH) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less