This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/31/2023 at 06:07:18 (UTC).

Directv, LLC v. Synmatix, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2022 Directv, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Synmatix, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is George Levi Russell, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02817

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Levi Russell, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Directv, LLC

Defendants

Synmatix, L.L.C.

Tencomm LLC

Syed Sami ul Hassan

Syed Faisal Abbas

Anzil Nadeem

XYZ Companies 1-10

John Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Michael Stoll

Gail Podolsky

Stacey K Sutton

Defendant Attorneys

William Stuart Heyman

Jan Ingham Berlage

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) Correspondence re: Scheduling Conference (Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

29 #2

Standing Order on Discovery Procedures

29 #1

Preliminary Scheduling Order

29 #29

Main Document

#28

(#28) NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Tencomm LLC (c/m to defendant Tencomm LLC on 5/2/2023). (dg4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

#27

(#27) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tencomm LLC (c/m to defendant Tencomm LLC on 5/2/2023). (dg4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

26 #2

Exhibit B

26 #1

Exhibit A

26 #26

Main Document

1 #13

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #1

Main Document

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Correspondence re: Scheduling Conference (Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 05/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • Docket(#30) ORDER: RESCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE to Friday June 9, 2023 at 10:00am. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call to chambers or circulate a conference call number to the parties. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/18/2023. (ats, Chambers) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) LETTER ORDER to Counsel of Record Scheduling a Conference Call for May 22, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Scheduling Order, #2 Standing Order on Discovery Procedures)(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Tencomm LLC (c/m to defendant Tencomm LLC on 5/2/2023). (dg4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tencomm LLC (c/m to defendant Tencomm LLC on 5/2/2023). (dg4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense Against Tencomm LLC by Directv, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 05/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION for Protective Order Regarding The Handling of Confidential Information by Directv, LLC(Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 04/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Anzil Nadeem (c/m to defendant Anzil Nadeem on 4/25/2023). (dg4s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/26/2023 (dg4s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Anzil Nadeem (c/m to defendant Anzil Nadeem on 4/25/2023). (dg4s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/26/2023 (dg4s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Directv, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 04/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Directv, LLC. Tencomm LLC served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/25/2022.(Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Directv, LLC. Synmatix, L.L.C. served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/25/2022.(Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Directv, LLC. Syed Sami ul Hassan served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/25/2022.(Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Directv, LLC. Syed Faisal Abbas served on 11/3/2022, answer due 11/25/2022.(Podolsky, Gail) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Expedite Limited Discovery and Permission to Serve Foreign Entities Via Courier by Directv, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoll, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 21 days as to Syed Faisal Abbas, Syed Sami ul Hassan, Anzil Nadeem, Synmatix, L.L.C., Tencomm LLC.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Directv, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summonses for XYZ Companies 1-10 and John Does 1-10. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summonses for XYZ Companies 1-10 and John Does 1-10 using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summonses for XYZ Companies 1-10 and John Does 1-10 to #1 Complaint. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Directv, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Directv Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent AT&T Inc., Corporate Parent DIRECTV Financing, LLC, Corporate Parent DIRECTV Financing Holdco, LLC, Corporate Parent DIRECTV Entertainment Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent TPG VIII Merlin Investment Holdings, L.P. for Directv, LLC.(Stoll, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Stoll, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Synmatix, L.L.C., Tencomm LLC, Syed Sami ul Hassan, Syed Faisal Abbas, Anzil Nadeem ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10244415.), filed by Directv, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Stoll, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less