This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2020 at 09:23:27 (UTC).

Direct Supply Inc v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Direct Supply Inc filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen C Dries and Lynn Adelman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01095

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Stephen C Dries

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Direct Supply Inc

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry R White

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper, SC

411 East Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Robert E Dallman

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper SC

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Matthew J Thome

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper, SC

411 East Wisconsin Avenue, Suite 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorney

Jordan David Howlette

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (DC)

555 4Th St Nw, Po Box 7238

Washington, DC 20044-7238

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Summons

1 #3

Summons Summons

1 #4

Summons Summons

1 #5

Exhibit Rule 7.1 Diclosure

#2

#3

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

RESTRICTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Howlette, Jordan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Supply Inc (White, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Supply Inc Court's magistrate judge consent form (White, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Supply Inc updated Summons on Hon. Charles Rettig (White, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Direct Supply Inc Consent/Refusal to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge (White, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Direct Supply Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (White, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to The Honorable Charles P. Rettig. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Direct Supply Inc (White, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Direct Supply Inc. United States of America served on 7/20/2020. (White, Barry)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to United States of America. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United States of America by Direct Supply Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3513285) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Rule 7.1 Diclosure)(White, Barry) Modified on 7/20/2020 (amb).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Direct Supply, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J. Thome