This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:15:25 (UTC).

Direct Energy Business, LLC et al v. California Asphalt Production, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 Direct Energy Business, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Asphalt Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Christina A. Snyder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09098

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Direct Energy Business, LLC

Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC dba Direct Energy Business

Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC

Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC doing business as Direct Energy Business

Defendants

California Asphalt Production, Inc. fka Greka Refining Company

California Asphalt Production, Inc.

Greka Refining Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alec S DiMario

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1055 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 500

Pasadena, CA 91106

Jarrod B Martin

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Jodi Krystyn Swick

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1 Kaiser Plaza Suite 340

Oakland, CA 94612

Kate H Easterling

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP

1001 Fannin Street Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#17

(#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Direct Energy Business, LLC answer now due 12/19/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business, LLC; Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC.(DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Jarrod B. Martin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff DIRECT ENERGY BUSINESS, LLC and Direct Energy Marketing Business, LLC, designating Alec S. DiMario as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#14

(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Direct Energy Business, LLC, Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, upon Defendant California Asphalt Production, Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Capitol Corporate Services, Inc. Registered Agent for Service of Process authorized to accept service under FRCP Rule 4 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jarrod B. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24694326) filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Kate H Easterling APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business, LLC, Direct Energy Marketing Business, LLC, designating Alec S DiMario as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#12

(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant California Asphalt Production, Inc. (c/o Registered Agent Capitol Corporate Services, Inc. ) (lc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kate H. Easterling to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24666549) filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#10

(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC. (Swick, Jodi) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jarrod B Martin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kate H Easterling. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant California Asphalt Production, Inc. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Centrica PLC. (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24653250 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business, LLC, Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC dba Direct Energy Business. (Attorney Alec S DiMario added to party Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC dba Direct Energy Business(pty:pla), Attorney Alec S DiMario added to party Direct Energy Business, LLC(pty:pla))(DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Direct Energy Business, LLC answer now due 12/19/2019, filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business, LLC; Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC.(DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Jarrod B. Martin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff DIRECT ENERGY BUSINESS, LLC and Direct Energy Marketing Business, LLC, designating Alec S. DiMario as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Direct Energy Business, LLC, Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, upon Defendant California Asphalt Production, Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Capitol Corporate Services, Inc. Registered Agent for Service of Process authorized to accept service under FRCP Rule 4 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jarrod B. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24694326) filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Kate H Easterling APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business, LLC, Direct Energy Marketing Business, LLC, designating Alec S DiMario as local counsel. (bm) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant California Asphalt Production, Inc. (c/o Registered Agent Capitol Corporate Services, Inc. ) (lc) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kate H. Easterling to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24666549) filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC, Direct Energy Business, LLC. (Swick, Jodi) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jarrod B Martin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kate H Easterling. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant California Asphalt Production, Inc. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Centrica PLC. (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC dba Direct Energy Business, Direct Energy Business, LLC. (Swick, Jodi) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC dba Direct Energy Business, Direct Energy Business, LLC. (DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24653250 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Direct Energy Business, LLC, Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC dba Direct Energy Business. (Attorney Alec S DiMario added to party Direct Energy Business Marketing, LLC dba Direct Energy Business(pty:pla), Attorney Alec S DiMario added to party Direct Energy Business, LLC(pty:pla))(DiMario, Alec) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Asphalt Production, Inc. fka Greka Refining Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct Energy Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alec S DiMario