This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/14/2022 at 07:26:51 (UTC).

DIPRETA v. TRANSUNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 DIPRETA filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against TRANSUNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire C. Cecchi and Jessica S. Allen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Jessica S. Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETER DIPRETA

Defendants

TRANSUNION, LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

I.C. SYSTEM, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAAKOV SAKS

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plaza, Suite 620

Hackensack, NJ 07601-2726

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., I.C. SYSTEM, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt,) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER DIPRETA. TRANSUNION, LLC served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER DIPRETA. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions by PETER DIPRETA (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER DIPRETA. I.C. SYSTEM, INC. served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER of dismissal as to Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/16/2022. (bt) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer FOR DEFENDANT TRANSUNION, LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by PETER DIPRETA. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Parties Motion for Extension of Time, Defendant Transunion LLC has until 3/11/2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/22/2022. (bt) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement as to TransUnion LLC by PETER DIPRETA (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement as to TransUnion LLC by PETER DIPRETA (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Parties Motion for Extension of Time, Defendant Transunion LLC has until 3/11/2022 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/22/2022. (bt) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer FOR DEFENDANT TRANSUNION, LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT. Motion set for 3/21/2022 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer FOR DEFENDANT TRANSUNION, LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by PETER DIPRETA. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER of dismissal as to Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. etc. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 2/16/2022. (bt) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER DIPRETA. I.C. SYSTEM, INC. served on 1/31/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions by PETER DIPRETA (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER DIPRETA. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by PETER DIPRETA. TRANSUNION, LLC served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., I.C. SYSTEM, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (bt,) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., I.C. SYSTEM, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13109168) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PETER DIPRETA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SAKS, YAAKOV) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IC SYSTEM INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant