This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 17:10:02 (UTC).

Dipak Patel et al v. Sylvia Sicre

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Dipak Patel filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sylvia Sicre. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00821

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dipak Patel

Shalu Corporation

Petitioners and Defendants

Does 1 through 10, Inclusive

Sylvia Sicre

Indio, CA 92201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank A Weiser

Attorney at Law Offices of Frank Weiser

3460 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1212

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #20 , REQUEST to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #12 . #22 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #21 served on 11/23/2021. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#23

(#23) RESPONSIVE DECLARATION of Sylvia Sicre re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Sylvia Sicre. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#22

(#22) REQUEST to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #12 and Opposition to Motion for Default Judgment filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre, identifying Corporate Parent None for Sylvia Sicre. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre.(mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#19

(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Sylvia Sicre #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#18

(#18) DECLARATION of Anna Ochoa Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Sylvia Sicre #16 Declaration of Anna Ochoa in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Sylvia Sicre filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#12

(#22) REQUEST to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #12 and Opposition to Motion for Default Judgment filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, the Motion for Default Judgment #16 set for hearing on December 20, 2021, is hereby continued to January 10, 2022, at 9:00 A.M. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #20 , REQUEST to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #12 . #22 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #21 served on 11/23/2021. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSIVE DECLARATION of Sylvia Sicre re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Sylvia Sicre. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REQUEST to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #12 and Opposition to Motion for Default Judgment filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre, identifying Corporate Parent None for Sylvia Sicre. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Sylvia Sicre.(mrgo) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Sylvia Sicre #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Anna Ochoa Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Sylvia Sicre #16 Declaration of Anna Ochoa in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DECLARATION of Dipak Patel Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Sylvia Sicre #16 Declaration of Dipak Patel in Support of Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Sylvia Sicre filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 12/20/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation, upon Defendant Sylvia Sicre served on 5/20/2021, answer due 6/10/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sylvia Sicre in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Sylvia Sicre. (twdb) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Dipak Patel, Plaintiff Shalu Corporation, Defendant Sylvia Sicre. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31260687 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Dipak Patel, Shalu Corporation. (Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Dipak Patel(pty:pla), Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Shalu Corporation(pty:pla))(Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank A Weiser