This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/14/2021 at 09:40:54 (UTC).

Dion v. Wright et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Dion filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wright. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane J Humetewa and Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00441

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Diane J Humetewa

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jaime Dion

Wright, Jaime Dion

Jaime Dion Wright

Defendants

Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Supplemental Excess Benefit Retirement Plan

Pinnacle West Administrative Committee

Pinnacle West Capital Corporation

Bradley Eugene Wright

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul F Eckstein

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP

Po Box 400

Phoenix, AZ 85001-0400

Thomas Dean Ryerson

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Mikaela Nicole Colby

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph G Adams

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Zachary Gerald Schroeder

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer LLP - Phoenix, AZ

1 Arizona Center, 400 E Van Buren

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2202

Randall Papetti

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP - Phoenix Office

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#26

#25

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bradley Eugene Wright.(Papetti, Randall) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER Defendants' Unopposed #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer is GRANTED. Defendant Bradley Eugene Wright may have until 4/21/2021 to file an Answer. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/19/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 6/03/2021 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/19/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/19/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 4/19/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER that this matter has been reassigned by the Clerk of Court, by random lot, to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich, United States District Judge. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-21-00441-PHX-SMB. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for June 1, 2021, before the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/16/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Bradley Eugene Wright. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Papetti, Randall) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE re: Joint Notice to Court by Jaime Dion . (Eckstein, Paul) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle West Capital Corporation. (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle West Administrative Committee identifying Corporate Parent Pinnacle West Capital Corporation for Pinnacle West Administrative Committee. (Adams, Joseph) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Summons Submitted filed by Jaime Dion. Defendant name does not match docket or complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Pinnacle West Capital Corporation, Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Supplemental Excess Benefit Retirement Plan. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Submitted by Jaime Dion. (Eckstein, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Submitted by Jaime Dion. (Eckstein, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Submitted by Jaime Dion. (Eckstein, Paul) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/16/2021. (LFIG) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bradley Eugene Wright. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19253884. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-441-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Jaime Dion. (Eckstein, Paul) (MCO) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERTIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTION RELIEF. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19253884 filed by Jaime Dion. (Eckstein, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(MCO) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinnacle West Capital Corporation Group Life & Medical Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall Papetti

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph G. Adams