This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2021 at 08:34:23 (UTC).

Diocese of Winona-Rochester v. United States Fire Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Diocese of Winona-Rochester filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against United States Fire Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Richard Nelson and Joan N. Ericksen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-00753

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Susan Richard Nelson

Joan N. Ericksen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diocese of Winona-Rochester

Defendants

Northwestern National Insurance Company of Milwaukee

21st Century Centennial Insurance Company f/k/a Colonial Penn Insurance Company

Interstate Fire and Casualty Company

United States Fire Insurance Company

Sphere Drake Insurance PLC

Dominion Insurance Company Limited

National Surety Corporation

St. Paul Surplus Lines Insurance Company

St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

Sompo Japan Nipponkoa Insurance Company of Europe Limited

CX Reinsurance Company Limited

Catalina Holdings U.K. LTD.

Assicurazioni Generali SPA

Markel International Insurance Company

Strong Hold Insurance Company Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher W Coon

Attorney at Restovich Braun & Associates

117 East Center Street

Rochester, MN 55904

Thomas R Braun

Attorney at Restovich Braun & Associates

117 E Center St.

Rochester, MN 55904

Jeff Bowen

Attorney at Burns Bowen Bair LLP

1 S. Pinckney Street, Ste 930

Madison, WI 53703

Jesse Bair

Attorney at Burns Bowen Bair LLP

1 S. Pinckney Street, Ste 930

Madison, WI 53703

Timothy Burns

Attorney at Burns Bowen Bair LLP

1 S. Pinckney Street, Suite 930

Madison, WI 53703

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah E Doerr

Attorney at Moss & Barnett, PA

150 S 5Th St Ste 1200

Mpls, MN 55402

Charles E Jones

Attorney at Moss & Barnett, a Professional Association

150 South Sixth Street, Suite 1200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Amy J Woodworth

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, PLLP

33 S 6Th St Ste 4400

Mpls, MN 55402

Charles E Spevacek

Attorney at Meagher & Geer, PLLP

33 S 6Th St Ste 4400

Mpls, MN 55402

Pamela J Tillman

Attorney at Meissner Tierney Fisher & Nichols S.C.

111 East Kilbourn Avenue, Ste 1900

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Michael J. Cohen

Attorney at Meissner Tierney Fisher & Nichols S.C.

111 East Kilbourn Avenue, Ste 1900

Milwaukee, WI 53221

Gerald H Bren

Attorney at Fisher Bren & Sheridan LLP

920 Second Avenue South, Suite 975

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lance D Meyer

Attorney at O'Meara Leer Wagner & Kohl, PA

7401 Metro Blvd Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55439-3034

Dale O. Thornsjo

Attorney at O'Meara Leer Wagner & Kohl, PA

7401 Metro Blvd Ste 600

Minneapolis, MN 55439-3034

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Objection to renewed motion

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #3

18-03094 Adversary Proceeding Docket Sheet

1 #4

18-33707 Bankruptcy Case Docket Sheet

1 #5

Identification of Residence

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

#12

#13

#15

#16

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-33707. Adversary Proceeding number 18-03094. filed by United States Fire Insurance Company.(Spevacek, Charles) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY re #1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-33707. Adversary Proceeding number 18-03094. filed by United States Fire Insurance Company.(Spevacek, Charles) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jesse Bair for Diocese of Winona-Rochester; granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeff Bowen for Diocese of Winona-Rochester; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy Burns for Diocese of Winona-Rochester. Approved by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 4/1/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy W. Burns. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8652364 filed by Diocese of Winona-Rochester. (Coon, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeff J. Bowen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8652352 filed by Diocese of Winona-Rochester. (Coon, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jesse J. Bair. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8652299 filed by Diocese of Winona-Rochester. (Coon, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Richard Nelson no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 21-cv-753 (JNE). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen and Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/26/2021.(MMP) Modified text on 3/29/2021 (kt). (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Pamela J Tillman for United States Fire Insurance Company; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J. Cohen for United States Fire Insurance Company. Approved by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/25/2021. (NAH) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Cohen. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8628454 filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Woodworth, Amy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Pamela J. Tillman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-8628424 filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Woodworth, Amy) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E Spevacek on behalf of United States Fire Insurance Company. (Spevacek, Charles) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL (CLK) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#4) (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Donovan S. Asmar, Michelle Czapski, Michael J Cohen as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Bankruptcy) list. Please use case number 21-cv-753 SRN. (CLK) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(LH) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION TO WITHDRAW REFERENCE from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-33707. Adversary Proceeding number 18-03094. filed by United States Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Objection to renewed motion, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 18-03094 Adversary Proceeding Docket Sheet, #4 18-33707 Bankruptcy Case Docket Sheet, #5 Identification of Residence) (LH) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dominion Insurance Company Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHWESTERN NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSICURAZIONI GENERALI SpA is a litigant